Harper v. Charter Communications, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lionel Harper
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc. and Charter Communications, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01749
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
2 Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC in re #10 Motion to Compel,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(McGuigan, Kathryn)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Judicial Proceedings by Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC. Motion Hearing SET for 12/16/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn McGuigan, #2 Declaration of John Fries, #3 Declaration of Chase Cassidy, #4 Proposed Order) (McGuigan, Kathryn) Modified on 10/28/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 11/20/2019 re #8 Motion for Leave to Take Expediated Discovery by Lionel Harper. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Soderstrom, Jamin) Modified on 10/28/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Lionel Harper. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. (Soderstrom, Jamin) Modified on 10/25/2019 (Coll, A).
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC. Attorney McGuigan, Kathryn T. added. (McGuigan, Kathryn)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Pursuant to the Court's Related Case Order reassigning this action to Senior Judge William B. Shubb issued 9/12/2019 (Docket No. #5 ), the parties are hereby notified a Scheduling Conference is set for 1/21/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A joint status report shall be filed no later than 1/7/2020, in accordance with the attached order. *All other pending dates in this action are HEREBY VACATED. (Kirksey Smith, K) *Modified on 9/12/2019 (Kirksey Smith, K).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/11/19 REASSIGNING this CASE to Senior Judge William B. Shubb for all further proceedings. The New Case Number is 2:19-CV-01749 WBS DMC. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-00902 by Lionel Harper. (Soderstrom, Jamin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jamin S. Soderstrom* *Soderstrom Law Firm* *3 Park Plaza, Suite 100* *Irvine, CA 92614*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lionel Harper. Attorney Soderstrom, Jamin S. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8443144) #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Soderstrom, Jamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Charter Communications, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn T. McGuigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn T. McGuigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Harper
Represented By: Jamin S. Soderstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?