Clifford v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: John Clifford
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01756
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 ***CASE CLOSED - New case number 1:19-cv-1315-DAD-BAM. (Marrujo, C)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Eric John Buhr,Alexis Anne Rochlin for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated,Eric John Buhr,Alexis Anne Rochlin for C R Bard Incorporated. (Buhr, Eric)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lewis, Shawtina)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Lewis, Shawtina)
September 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Substitution of Attorney Order,and #10 Substitution of Attorney Order served on Christopher Kyle Johnston NCAED, Richard B North, Jr , NCAED. (York, M)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/13/2019 SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Shawtina Ferguson Lewis as counsel of record in place of Attorney Richard B North, Jr., NCAED, to represent C R Bard Incorporated. (York, M)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/13/2019 SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Shawtina Ferguson Lewis as counsel of record in place of Attorney Richard B North, Jr., NCAED, to represent Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (York, M)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by C R Bard Incorporated. (Lewis, Shawtina)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Lewis, Shawtina)
September 6, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Clerk's Notice, #7 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Christopher Kyle Johnston NCAED, Richard B North, Jr NCAED. (Jessen, A)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Directing Attorneys Christopher Kyle Johnston and Richard B. North, Jr. to submit Pro Hac Vice Application to practice in the Eastern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application). (Jessen, A)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-00832.
September 5, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Eastern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-832-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15266535 filed by John Clifford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Clifford
Represented By: Christopher Kyle Johnston, NCAED
Represented By: Christopher Kyle Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr, NCAED
Represented By: Alexis Anne Rochlin
Represented By: Eric John Buhr
Represented By: Shawtina Ferguson Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr, NCAED
Represented By: Alexis Anne Rochlin
Represented By: Eric John Buhr
Represented By: Shawtina Ferguson Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?