Engberson v. General Motors Company, et al.,
Plaintiff: Rodney Engberson
Defendant: General Motors Company and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01761
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/30/2019 ORDERING Attorney Darin J. Lang, to appear for General Motors, LLC. (Reader, L)
October 1, 2019 RECEIPT number CAE200101296 for $225 for Darin J. Lang from Nelson Mullins Riley et al. (Zignago, K.)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by General Motors LLC for attorney Darin J. Lang to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Cosgrove, Ryan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by General Motors LLC re #2 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Pretrial Scheduling Order Mailed)(Cosgrove, Ryan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.(Cosgrove, Ryan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Nevada County Superior Court, case number CU19-083828 by General Motors Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8446964) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Cosgrove, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engberson v. General Motors Company, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Ryan Cosgrove
Represented By: Darin J. Lang, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Engberson
Represented By: Alexis Galindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?