(PC) Vallery v. Degallegos, et al
Plaintiff: Raynard Vallery
Defendant: Degallegos, D. Halverson and R. Neuschmid
Case Number: 2:2019cv01813
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/28/2019 GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff to file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Raynard Vallery. (Henshaw, R)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to 11/30/19 to file Opposition to #8 Order and Amend Complaint by Raynard Vallery. (Coll, A)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/4/2019 DISMISSING #1 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Raynard Vallery. (Henshaw, R)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-1813-JAM-DMC (PC). (Coll, A)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Raynard Vallery. (Coll, A)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Raynard Vallery. (Coll, A)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 09/20/19 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP . Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Richard Vallery. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M) Modified on 9/20/2019 (Plummer, M).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order Directing Prisoner Payment,, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Raynard Vallery. (Plummer, M)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/11/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 10/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Benson, A.)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Raynard Vallery. (Benson, A.)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Raynard Vallery. (Benson, A.)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Raynard Vallery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Vallery v. Degallegos, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Degallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Neuschmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynard Vallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?