Burrell v. City of Vallejo et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Burrell and Michael Walton
Defendant: Ryan McLaughlin, City of Vallejo, Andrew Bidou and David McLaughlin
Case Number: 2:2019cv01898
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading [Local Rule 144(a)] by Andrew Bidou, City of Vallejo, David McLaughlin. Attorney Allen, Kevin P. added. (Allen, Kevin) Modified on 10/30/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Andrew Bidou served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; City of Vallejo served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019; David McLaughlin served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Pointer, Adante)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *David McLaughlin* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Melissa Catherine Nold* *Law Office of John Burris* *7677 Oakport St., Suite 1120* *Oakland, CA 94621*. (Huang, H)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Adrian Burrell, Michael Walton.(Nold, Melissa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Adante Pointer on behalf of Adrian Burrell. Attorney Pointer, Adante added. (Pointer, Adante)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Andrew Bidou, City of Vallejo, Ryan McLaughlin* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Melissa Catherine Nold* *7677 Oakport St.* *Suite 1120* *Oakland, CA 94621*. (Coll, A)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Adrian Burrell, Michael Walton. Attorney Nold, Melissa Catherine added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8469099) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nold, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrell v. City of Vallejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Burrell
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Walton
Represented By: Melissa Catherine Nold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Represented By: Kevin P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bidou
Represented By: Kevin P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David McLaughlin
Represented By: Kevin P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?