Nguyen v. Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Nguyen
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC and 504 Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv01939
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 2/6/2020 is VACATED and RESET for 2/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due 1/24/2020. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/7/2019 CONTINUING Hearing on #6 Motion to Remand to 2/7/2020, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. All opposition and reply briefs due to be filed in connection with the Motion will now be due based on the newly set hearing dates and in accordance with the Local Rules. (York, M)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Continue #6 Motion to Remand by Nancy Nguyen. (Shimoda, Galen)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to REMAND the Action to State Court by Nancy Nguyen. Attorney Shimoda, Galen T. added. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration of Galen T. Shimoda, #3 Declaration of Nancy Nguyen, #4 Proposed Order)(Shimoda, Galen) Modified on 10/28/2019 (Reader, L).
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nicole Rachelle Roysdon on behalf of Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. Attorney Roysdon, Nicole Rachelle added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roysdon, Nicole)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Kosch, Lois)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kosch, Lois)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2019-00263185 by Cardinal Health, Inc. and Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8478833) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration, #7 Notice of Interested Parties, #8 Proof of Service)(Kosch, Lois)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Lois Marie Kosch
Represented By: Nicole Rachelle Roysdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Lois Marie Kosch
Represented By: Nicole Rachelle Roysdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 504 Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Nguyen
Represented By: Brittany Victoria Berzin
Represented By: Galen T. Shimoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?