Access Biologicals, LLC v. XPO Logistics, LLC
Plaintiff: Access Biologicals, LLC
Defendant: XPO Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01964
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/15/19. Added attorney Robert Mark Borak, PHV for XPO Logistics, LLC, (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 15, 2019 PAYMENT for #13 Pro Hac Vice Application in the amount of $225, receipt number 0972-8572417. (Gavrilov, Ognian)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by XPO Logistics, LLC for attorney Robert Mark Borak to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gavrilov, Ognian) Modified on 11/18/2019 (York, M).
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by XPO Logistics, LLC re #10 Declaration, #11 Proposed Order, #9 MOTION to DISMISS. (Gavrilov, Ognian)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re Motion to Dismiss re #10 Declaration, #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Gavrilov, Ognian)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Jan Perry in support of #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Gavrilov, Ognian)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by XPO Logistics, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Gavrilov, Ognian)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to the complaint by XPO Logistics, LLC. Attorney Gavrilov, Ognian Anguelov added. (Gavrilov, Ognian) Modified on 10/31/2019 (Reader, L).
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Access Biologicals, LLC served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Mallord, Joel)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 [DISREGARD - deficient; attorney to re-file] STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME for Defendant to Respond to #1 Complaint by Access Biologicals, LLC. (Mallord, Joel) Modified on 10/21/2019 (Michel, G.).
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *XPO Logistics, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joel Mallord* *Huang Ybarra Gelberg & May LLP* *550 South Hope St., Suite 1850* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Tupolo, A)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 [DISREGARD- see #5 Summons] SUMMONS ISSUED as to *XPO Logistics, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joel Mallord* *Huang Ybarra Gelberg & May LLP* *550 South Hope St., Suite 1850* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Tupolo, A) Modified on 10/1/2019 (Donati, J).
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Access Biologicals, LLC. (Mallord, Joel)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XPO Logistics, LLC by Access Biologicals, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8485742). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mallord, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Access Biologicals, LLC v. XPO Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Robert Mark Borak, PHV
Represented By: Ognian Anguelov Gavrilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Access Biologicals, LLC
Represented By: Joel Mallord
Represented By: Joseph J. Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?