(PC) Dixon v. Lizarraga et al
Plaintiff: Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr.
Defendant: S. Palomares, K. Staley, L. Lundy, D. Stephens, D. Crounse, Daniel Navarro, G. McCarthy, Joe Lizarraga, R. Briggs and C. Heintschel
Case Number: 2:2019cv01966
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr (Coll, A)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr.(Coll, A)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr. (Tupolo, A)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr (Tupolo, A)
October 22, 2019 CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr, CDCR# G-47695 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr. (Tupolo, A)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr., regarding #5 motion to proceed ifp. (Reader, L)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr. (Tupolo, A)
October 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and ifp served on Delmar Jewell Dixon Jr.. (Yin, K)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/2/2019 ORDERING plaintiff to submit either the filing fee or the application required by 1915(a) within 30 days. The Clerk shall mail plaintiff an ifp form. (Yin, K)
September 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #2 Order served on Delmar Jewell Dixon Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/26/19. New Case Number 2:19-cv-1966-EFB. Old Case Number 1:19-CV-01326-GSA PC. (Marrujo, C)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against R. Briggs, D. Crounse, C. Heintschel, Joe Lizarraga, L. Lundy, G. McCarthy, Daniel Navarro, S. Palomares, K. Staley, D. Stephens by Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Orozco, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Dixon v. Lizarraga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Palomares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Crounse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Heintschel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmar Jewell Dixon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?