(PC) Davis v. Felder et al
Plaintiff: Ronnell Davis
Defendant: B. Harris, R. Crook and M. Felder
Case Number: 2:2019cv01976
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to #6 Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-01976-JAM-EFB. (York, M)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Ronnell Davis. (York, M)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ronnell Davis. (York, M)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ronnell Davis. (Plummer, M)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENTS SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Order, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kern Valley State Prison. (Jessen, A)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/27/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Jessen, A)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/30/2019. New Case Number 2:19-cv-01976-EFB (PC). Old Case Number 1:19-cv-01363-GSA (PC). (Jessen, A)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ronnell Davis. (Orozco, A)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against R. Crook, M. Felder, B. Harris by Ronnell Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Orozco, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Davis v. Felder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnell Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?