United States of America v. Weaver et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Mary Sue Weaver, Mortgage Lender Service Inc, Norman P. Creighton and Mortgage Lender Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02046
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Mortgage Lender Services, Inc.. (Blaine, Carl)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Mortgage Lender Services, Inc.. Attorney Blaine, Carl Paul added.(Blaine, Carl)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Norman P. Creighton served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Tubesing, Robin)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mary Sue Weaver served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Tubesing, Robin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc. served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Tubesing, Robin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED SUMMONS RE-ISSUED as to *Norman P. Creighton, Individually and as Trustee and Beneficiary of The Norman P. Creighton 1996 Trust, Mortgage Lender Services, Inc., Mary Sue Weaver* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robin Tubesing* *Department Of Justice, United States Attorney's Office* *2500 Tulare St., Suite 4401* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (York, M)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Norman P. Creighton, Individually and as Trustee and Beneficiary of the Norman P. Creighton 1996 Trust * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robin Tubesing* *Department Of Justice, United States Attorney's Office* *2500 Tulare St., Suite 4401* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Kastilahn, A)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Norman P. Creighton, Mortgage Lender Service Inc, Mary Sue Weaver* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robin Tubesing* *Department Of Justice, United States Attorney's Office* *2500 Tulare Street, Suite 4401* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Tupolo, A)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Set Aside Fraudulent Transfer against Norman P. Creighton, Mortgage Lender Service Inc, Mary Sue Weaver by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tubesing, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Weaver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Sue Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Lender Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman P. Creighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Lender Services, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Paul Blaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robin Tubesing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?