Wirbick v. Sundt Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cody Wirbick
Defendant: Sundt Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02067
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 Class Action Joint Statement by Defendant Sundt Construction, Inc. (Cridland, Graham) Modified on 11/14/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sundt Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Painter, Charles)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/4/2019 ORDERING attorney Helen R. Holden, PHV, added for Sundt Construction, Inc. (Zignago, K.)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Sundt Construction, Inc. for attorney Helen Holden (ECF No. 6). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Sundt Construction, Inc. for attorney Helen Holden to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8534619) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Painter, Charles)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Sundt Construction, Inc.. (Ullrich, Gabriel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 [DISREGARD - COUNSEL TO REFILE WITH POS ATTACHED] CERTIFICATE of SERVICE of Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order by Sundt Construction, Inc. Attorney Ullrich, Gabriel Rogers added. (Ullrich, Gabriel) Modified on 10/16/2019 (Benson, A.).
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Graham Matthew Cridland on behalf of Sundt Construction, Inc.. (Cridland, Graham)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano County Superior, case number FCS053488 by Sundt Construction, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8513476) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Corporate Disclosure statement, #5 Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Notice, #7 Exhibit)(Cridland, Graham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wirbick v. Sundt Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundt Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Graham Matthew Cridland
Represented By: Charles Stephen Painter
Represented By: Gabriel Rogers Ullrich
Represented By: Helen R. Holden, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Wirbick
Represented By: Nicholas Rosenthal
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Represented By: Kristen M. Agnew
Represented By: Larry W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?