Zenith Insurance Company v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zenith Insurance Company
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02068
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Crisp, Kevin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Zenith Insurance Company. (Williams, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.. (Crisp, Kevin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. re #5 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Crisp, Kevin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED DECLARATION by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Crisp, Kevin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE of REMOVAL by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crisp, Kevin)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Kevin R. Crisp. (Crisp, Kevin)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court County of San Joaquin, case number STK-CV-UPL-2019-11017 by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8514092) (Crisp, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zenith Insurance Company v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenith Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey James Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Robert Crisp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?