(PS) Ortiz v. Torres
Plaintiff: Rene Ortiz
Defendant: Wendy Torres
Case Number: 2:2019cv02098
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
2 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY by Wendy Torres re #10 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Joseph B. Frueh, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Frueh, Joseph)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Communication from Joseph B. Frueh by Rene Ortiz. (Huang, H)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS by Wendy Torres. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Joseph B. Frueh, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Proof of Service)(Frueh, Joseph) Modified on 11/5/2019 (Becknal, R).
October 31, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order, #9 Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Rene Ortiz. (Kaminski, H)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Kaminski, H)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASES signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/29/19 ORDERING that this action is related with member cases 2:19-cv-02089-TLN-DB, 2:19-cv-02094-JAM-DB and 2:19-cv-02090-KJM DB and reassigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The caption on this case shall read: 2:19-cv-02098-TLN-DB. The motion to dismiss presently filed before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney is VACATED and shall be refiled before Magistrate Judge Barnes. The Clerk of the Court is to issue the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Kaminski, H)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL, MOTION for SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Rene Ortiz.(Tupolo, A)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Wendy Torres. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Certificate of Service) (Frueh, Joseph) Modified on 10/25/2019 (York, M).
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wendy Torres re #2 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Frueh, Joseph)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wendy Torres re #1 Notice of Removal. (Frueh, Joseph)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-cv-02089-TLN-DB, 2:19-cv-02090-KJM-DB, 2:19-cv-02094-JAM-DB, 2:19-cv-02098-TLN-CKD by Wendy Torres. (Frueh, Joseph)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Kaminski, H)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 19SC04073 by Wendy Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frueh, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Ortiz v. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Torres
Represented By: Joseph Frueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?