Manning v. Arconic Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Dwayne Manning
Defendant: Materion Brush Inc., U.S. Minerals, Inc., Arconic Inc., Wabco Holdings, Inc., Alcoa and Brush Wellman, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02202
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by U.S. Minerals, Inc. Attorney LaForce, Norman Charles added. (LaForce, Norman) Modified on 12/18/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Raphael Metzger. (Metzger, Raphael)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sheldon J. Warren on behalf of Materion Brush Inc.. (Warren, Sheldon)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY by Wabco Holdings, Inc. to RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Brown)(Pietrykowski, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Ronald Dwayne Manning to #10 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit "E", #7 Exhibit "F", #8 Exhibit "G", #9 Exhibit "H", #10 Exhibit "I", #11 Proposed Order)(Metzger, Raphael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT as to Interested Parties by Defendant U.S. Minerals, Inc. (Stinnett, Jennifer) Modified on 11/15/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the December 5, 2019 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #10 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of PERSONAL Jurisdiction by Wabco Holdings, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Lisa Brown, #3 Proposed Order)(Pietrykowski, Michael) Modified on 11/8/2019 (Reader, L).
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Ronald Dwayne Manning. (Metzger, Raphael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 JOINDER by Arconic Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Attorney Sadwick, David Brian added. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Notice of Interested Parties)(Sadwick, David) Modified on 11/6/2019 (Reader, L).
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by U.S. Minerals, Inc.. (Stinnett, Jennifer)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 JOINDER in Notice of Removal of Action by Materion Brush, Inc. by U.S. Minerals, Inc. (Stinnett, Jennifer) Modified on 11/6/2019 (Reader, L).
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Materion Brush Inc.. (Warren, Sheldon)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Materion Brush Inc.. (Warren, Sheldon)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 [DISREGARD - SEE #5 AMENDED] CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A) Modified on 11/1/2019 (Benson, A.).
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tehama County Superior Court, case number 19CI000219 by Materion Brush Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8545343) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Disclosure of Interested Parties, #3 Declaration)(Warren, Sheldon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Arconic Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Materion Brush Inc.
Represented By: Sheldon J. Warren
Represented By: Dani Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Minerals, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer K. Stinnett
Represented By: Norman Charles LaForce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arconic Inc.
Represented By: Juliet Arlene Markowitz
Represented By: David Brian Sadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wabco Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcoa
Represented By: Juliet Arlene Markowitz
Represented By: David Brian Sadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brush Wellman, Inc.
Represented By: Dani Rogers
Represented By: Sheldon J. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Dwayne Manning
Represented By: Raphael Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?