(PC) Ruiz v. Hubbard
Plaintiff: Rogelio May Ruiz
Defendant: A. Hubbard
Case Number: 2:2019cv02350
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Rogelio May Ruiz. (Coll, A)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-2350-JAM-AC (PC). (Coll, A)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Rogelio May Ruiz (Tupolo, A)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Rogelio May Ruiz, CDC F-59761 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
November 21, 2019 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Rogelio May Ruiz. (Huang, H)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *11/20/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 12/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Huang, H)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Rogelio May Ruiz. (Huang, H)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Rogelio May Ruiz. (Huang, H)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against A. Hubbard by Rogelio May Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Ruiz v. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio May Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?