(PC) Samaniego v. CDCR, et al
Plaintiff: Fernando Samaniego
Defendant: Jeff Lynch, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Ralph Diaz and California State Prison - Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2019cv02606
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Initial Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleading by Ralph Diaz, Jeff Lynch. Attorney Duggan, Jeremy added. (Duggan, Jeremy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ralph Diaz and Jeff Lynch* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Charles Carbone* *Law Offices of Charles Carbone* *P.O. Box 2809* *San Francisco, CA 94126*. (Henshaw, R)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/15/2020 DIRECTING Clerk to issue and send plaintiff 2 summonses for defendants Diaz and Lynch; ORDERING plaintiff to complete service of process within 60 days from the date of this order; ORDERING defendants to reply to the complaint within the time provided in Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a); DIRECTING Clerk to assign a district judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING defendants CDCR and CSP-SAC are dismissed with prejudice, plaintiff's claims against defendants Secretary Ralph Diaz and Acting Warden Jeff Lynch in their official capacities be dismissed with prejudice, and plaintiff's due process claims be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (2 summonses sent to Charles Carbone, Law Offices of Charles Carbone, P.O. Box 2809, San Francisco, CA 94126 and Mark Redmond, The Law Offices of Mark A. Redmond, 555 University Ave., Suite 154, Sacramento, CA 95825) (Henshaw, R)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:19-cv-2606 TLN KJN (PC). (Henshaw, R)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kastilahn, A)
December 26, 2019 RECEIPT number 0972-8638385 for $400.00 for Filing Fee from Carbone, Charles. (Kastilahn, A)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants by Fernando Samaniego. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carbone, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Samaniego v. CDCR, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Lynch
Represented By: Jeremy Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Represented By: Jeremy Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Prison - Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Samaniego
Represented By: Mark Redmond
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?