Goose Pond AG, Inc. v. Duarte Nursery Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Goose Pond AG, Inc.
Defendant: James Duarte, John Duarte and Duarte Nursery Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02631
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/20/2020 EXTENDING the time to respond to the complaint to 3/5/2020. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Further Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Goose Pond AG, Inc.. (Soran, Robert)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gerald E. Brunn on behalf of James Duarte, John Duarte, Duarte Nursery Inc.. Attorney Brunn, Gerald E. added. (Brunn, Gerald)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/30/20 ORDERING that Defendants shall have until February 20, 2020 to respond to the complaint. (Kaminski, H)
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by James Duarte, John Duarte, Duarte Nursery Inc.. (Prows, Peter)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David M. Ivester on behalf of James Duarte, John Duarte, Duarte Nursery Inc.. Attorney Ivester, David M. added. (Ivester, David)
January 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter Prows on behalf of James Duarte, John Duarte, Duarte Nursery Inc.. Attorney Prows, Peter added. (Prows, Peter)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: John Duarte served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Soran, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: James Duarte served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Soran, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Duarte Nursery Inc. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Soran, Robert)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *James Duarte, John Duarte, Duarte Nursery Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Janlynn R. Fleener* *Downey Brand LLP* *621 Capitol Mall, 18th Floor* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Kaminski, H)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Goose Pond AG, Inc.. (Fleener, Janlynn)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Goose Pond AG, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8645210) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fleener, Janlynn) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goose Pond AG, Inc. v. Duarte Nursery Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Duarte
Represented By: David M. Ivester
Represented By: Peter Prows
Represented By: Gerald E. Brunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Duarte
Represented By: David M. Ivester
Represented By: Peter Prows
Represented By: Gerald E. Brunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duarte Nursery Inc.
Represented By: David M. Ivester
Represented By: Peter Prows
Represented By: Gerald E. Brunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goose Pond AG, Inc.
Represented By: Janlynn R. Fleener
Represented By: Robert P. Soran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?