Parva Property Management, LLC, et al., v. USA
Petitioner: Parva Property Management, LLC and Parvaneh Alizadeh
Respondent: United States of America
Not Yet Classified: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019mc00105
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/15/2019 DISMISSING this action, with each side to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Huang, H)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal by Parvaneh Alizadeh, Parva Property Management, LLC, United States of America. (Duffy, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/8/19 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:19-mc-0106-TLN-EFB be, and the same hereby is, reassigned to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. Henceforth the caption on all documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:19-mc-0106-TLN-AC. (Becknal, R)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/8/19 ORDERING that respondent shall file and serve a response to both motions by 7/15/19. The Banks may also file and serve a response by that date, should they wish to participate in litigation of the motions. Petitioners' reply, if any, shall be due by 7/22/19. The motion to quash will be submitted on the papers upon the completion of briefing. If the court determines that oral argument is necessary, a hearing date will be scheduled. (Becknal, R)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charles M. Duffy on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Duffy, Charles M. added. (Duffy, Charles)
June 28, 2019 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED - Motion to Quash Summons. (Kastilahn, A)
June 28, 2019 RECEIPT number 0972-8335573 for $47.00 for Miscellaneous Filing Fee from Paul Warner. (Kastilahn, A)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS by Parva Property Management, LLC, Parvaneh Alizadeh. (Filing fee $ 46, receipt number 0972-8334517) (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Warner, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parva Property Management, LLC, et al., v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Parva Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Parvaneh Alizadeh
Represented By: Paul Anthony Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Charles M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?