Cutera, Inc. v. Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cutera, Inc.
Defendant: Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00235
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Cutera, Inc. for proceedings held on 3/4/2020 before Judge Kimberly J. Muller. Court Reporter Kacy Barajas. (Snyder, Meaghan)
March 22, 2020 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Ex Parte Application for TRO held on March 4, 2020, before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, filed by Court Reporter Kacy Barajas, Phone number 916-426-7640 E-mail kbarajas.csr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 4/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2020. (Barajas, K)
March 19, 2020 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc. for proceedings held on March 4, 2020 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Court Reporter Kacy Barajas. (Finberg, Dana)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER and ORDER Re: Preservation of Evidence signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/12/2020 GRANTING in PART #12 Cutera's Motion for a TRO against Lutronic, Inc., the terms of which the court provides below. The court has tailored the TRO to conform to the showing made by Cutera, it DECLINES to grant the elements of the requested TRO that are overbroad or unnecessary to prevent the irreparable harm alleged. Given this narrowing of the TRO, the court need not reach Lutronic's arguments based on CA Business and Professions Code section 16600. Lutronic's related request to seal, ECF No. #20 , is DENIED as MOOT, as described. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Preliminary Injunction, Defendant Lutronic is ORDERED to appear on 4/242020 at 10:00 AM, before Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller in Courtroom 3, why a preliminary injunction should not be granted and why it should not be RESTRAINED and ENJOINED pending Trial. If Lutronic does not consent to the duration of the TRO through the date currently set for the preliminary injunction hearing, it shall notify the court promptly and no later than 3/19/2020.(Reader, L)
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Dana J. Finberg in re #15 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Finberg, Dana) Modified on 3/16/2020 (Zignago, K.).
March 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dana J. Finberg, #2 Proposed Order)(Finberg, Dana)
March 4, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Shelby Eckerman in re #12 Motion for TRO. (Rosales, Ulrico) Modified on 3/6/2020 (Zignago, K.).
March 4, 2020 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Ulrico S. Rosales in re #12 Motion for TRO. (Rosales, Ulrico) Modified on 3/6/2020 (Zignago, K.).
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING held before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/4/2020. Plaintiff's Counsel, Ulrico Rosales and Meaghan Snyder, present. Defendant's Counsel, Dana Finberg and Sara Schneider, present. The court heard argument as to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for TRO, ECF No. #12 . The court ordered the supplemental briefing, as identified on the record, be filed by close of business today; whereupon, the matter will be submitted. An order will issue to resolve the application. Court Reporter: Kacy Barajas. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 27, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ORDERING oral argument as to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #12 , SET for 3/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 OPPOSITION by Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc. to #12 Motion for TRO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Finberg, #2 Exhibit 1-14, #3 Declaration of H. Hwang, #4 Declaration of P. Davis)(Finberg, Dana) Modified on 2/25/2020 (Kaminski, H).
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE Regarding Arbitration Matter Against Individual Employees filed by Plaintiff Cutera, Inc. (Rosales, Ulrico) (Docket Text Modified on 2/25/2020 by C. Schultz)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction and for Order re Preservation of Evidence. ECF No. #12 . Defendant's may file any opposition to the application no later than 5:00 PM on 2/24/2020. The court at this time declines to grant plaintiff's request for oral argument; however, the court will consider the briefing and set oral argument at a later date if appropriate. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER filed by Cutera, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Ulrico Rosales, #3 Declaration of Shelby Eckerman, #4 Declaration of Kevin Clarke, #5 Proposed Order, #6 TRO Checklist)(Rosales, Ulrico) (Docket Text Modified on 2/21/2020 by C. Schultz)
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc. on 2/10/2020, Answer due 4/10/2020 (Snyder, Meaghan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Meaghan A. Snyder on behalf of Cutera, Inc.. Attorney Snyder, Meaghan A. added. (Snyder, Meaghan)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 6/11/2020 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion to Change Venue by Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc. (Finberg, Dana) Modified on 2/11/2020 (Benson, A.).
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re #4 Motion to Dismiss by Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc. (Finberg, Dana) Modified on 2/11/2020 (Benson, A.).
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc.. (Finberg, Dana)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to CHANGE VENUE to the Northern District of CA by Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration)(Finberg, Dana) Modified on 2/11/2020 (Benson, A.).
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc. Attorney Finberg, Dana Johannes added. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Finberg, Dana)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
February 3, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ulrico S. Rosales* *Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati* *650 Page Mill Road* *Palo Alto, CA 94304*. (Kaminski, H)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc. by Cutera, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet)(Rosales, Ulrico)
January 31, 2020 RECEIPT number 0972-8704577 for $400.00 for filing fee from Rosales, Ulrico S.. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutera, Inc. v. Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutronic Aesthetics, Inc.
Represented By: Sara T. Schneider
Represented By: Dana Johannes Finberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cutera, Inc.
Represented By: Ulrico S. Rosales
Represented By: Meaghan A. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?