Schneider v. Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Schneider
Defendant: Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr, Tiffany Rose and County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2020cv00383
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of ERRATA by Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr, Tiffany Rose re #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim.. (Kline, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against County of Sacramento by Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr, Tiffany Rose. by Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr, Tiffany Rose.(Kline, Michael)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Sacramento* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patrick Matthew Buelna* *Law Offices of John Burris* *7677 Oakport Street, Suite 14120* *Oakland, CA 94621*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr, Tiffany Rose, County of Sacramento by Nathan Schneider.(Buelna, Patrick)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/1/2020 GRANTING Plaintiff leave to file a First Amended Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Nathan Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Buelna, Patrick) Modified on 3/30/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/3/2020 ORDERING that defendants Cubesmart and Tiffany Rose may have until 3/27/2020 to file a responsive pleading. (Zignago, K.)
March 3, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER for District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Krueger, M)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/3/2020: Pursuant to the Order referring this case back to the District Judge (ECF No. #8 ), the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan is hereby VACATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/2/2020 WITHDRAWING the referral of this case to the magistrate judge and REFERRING the case back to the district judge. (Coll, A)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extended Time to Answer Complaint Pursuant to Eastern District Local Rule 144(a) by Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr, Tiffany Rose. (Kline, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Patrick Matthew Buelna on behalf of Nathan Schneider. Attorney Buelna, Patrick Matthew added. (Buelna, Patrick)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr, Tiffany Rose. (Kline, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Michael G. Kline for Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr and Tiffany Rose, attorney Gregory Patrick Arakawa terminated . (Kline, Michael)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION of INTERESTED ENTITIES or PERSONS by All Defendants. (Arakawa, Gregory)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00273191 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8750866) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Arakawa, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider v. Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cubesmart Self Storage, CEO Christopher Marr
Represented By: Gregory Patrick Arakawa
Represented By: Michael G. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Rose
Represented By: Gregory Patrick Arakawa
Represented By: Michael G. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Schneider
Represented By: Patrick Matthew Buelna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?