Abad et al v. Bonham et al
Plaintiff: Austen Brown and Joseph Abad
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Charlton Bonham
Case Number: 2:2020cv00447
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Joseph Abad, Austen Brown for attorney Glenn E. Roper to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8861189) (Schiff, Damien)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sarine, Lisa)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/12/2020 EXTENDING Time to 5/7/2020, for Defendants to Answer to #1 Complaint. (York, M)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Xavier Becerra, Charlton Bonham. Attorney Sarine, Lisa Elizabeth added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sarine, Lisa)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service)(Trotter, Caleb)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (York, M)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, Charlton Bonham* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Damien Michael Schiff* *Pacific Legal Foundation* *930 G Street* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (York, M)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joseph Abad, Austen Brown. Attorney Schiff, Damien Michael added. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8764050) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schiff, Damien)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abad et al v. Bonham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Sarine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlton Bonham
Represented By: Lisa Elizabeth Sarine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austen Brown
Represented By: Damien Michael Schiff
Represented By: Caleb Randall Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Abad
Represented By: Damien Michael Schiff
Represented By: Caleb Randall Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?