Woltkamp v. Los Rios Classified Employees Association et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Woltkamp
Defendant: John Knight, Los Rios Community College District and Los Rios Classified Employees Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv00457
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
2 Judge: John A Mendez
3 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time for LRCEA to Respond to #1 Complaint by Los Rios Classified Employees Association. Attorney Alonso, Monique added. (Alonso, Monique) Modified on 4/8/2020 (Reader, L).
March 26, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Los Rios Classified Employees Association served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Sweigart, Karin)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: John Knight served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. (Sweigart, Karin)
March 26, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Los Rios Community College District served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (Sweigart, Karin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED CIVIL CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (Reader, L)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 [DISREGARD SEE [ #11 ]CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 02:20 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (Reader, L) Modified on 3/13/2020 (Reader, L).
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/13/2020 RELATING CASE(S) 2:19-CV-548 KJM DB and 2:20-CV-457 JAM AC. REASSIGNING CASE 2:20-CV-457 to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes for all further proceedings. District Judge John A. Mendez, Magistrate Judge Allison Claire no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:20-CV-457 KJM DB. (Reader, L)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/10/2020 ORDERING that the LRCCD Defendants shall remain as defendants in Plaintiff's lawsuit, but shall not oppose or otherwise contest the allegations or underlying legal theories in the Complaint. In exchange for the LRCCD Defendants' agreement not to oppose the allegations or underlying legal theories in the Complaint, Plaintiff shall waive her right to recover attorneys' fees and costs from the LRCCD Defendants if Plaintiff prevails in the lawsuit. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 9, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Los Rios CCD's Non-Opposition and Release From Costs and Fees by John Knight, Los Rios Community College District; Proposed Order (Covert, Spencer) Modified on 3/10/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Elgant Covert, Jr on behalf of John Knight, Los Rios Community College District. Attorney Covert, Spencer Elgant added. (Covert, Spencer)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:19-cv-00548-KJM-DB by Dawn Woltkamp. (Sweigart, Karin)
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of a Constitutional Challenge by Dawn Woltkamp. (Sweigart, Karin)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *John Knight, Los Rios Classified Employees Association, Los Rios Community College District* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Karin Moore Sweigart* *Freedom Foundation* *P.O. Box 552* *Olympia, WA 98507*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dawn Woltkamp. Attorney Sweigart, Karin Moore added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8767709) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sweigart, Karin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woltkamp v. Los Rios Classified Employees Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Knight
Represented By: Spencer Elgant Covert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Rios Community College District
Represented By: Spencer Elgant Covert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Rios Classified Employees Association
Represented By: Monique Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Woltkamp
Represented By: Karin Moore Sweigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?