B&G Foods North America, Inc. v. Embry et al
Plaintiff: B&G Foods North America, Inc.
Defendant: Noam Glick and Kim Embry
Case Number: 2:2020cv00526
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 19 OPPOSITION by Kim Embry, Noam Glick to #10 Motion to Change Venue,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arlene Calles, #2 Declaration of Noam Glick, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Glick, Noam)
May 1, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to DISMISS by Kim Embry, Noam Glick. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake Schulte, #2 Declaration of Arlene Calles, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J)(Glick, Noam)
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court has reviewed Defendant's Ex Parte Application to permit filing a brief in support of a motion to dismiss exceeding twenty pages, ECF No. #14 , as well as Plaintiff's Opposition, ECF No. #15 , and Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition, ECF No. #16 . Based on the briefing, the court DENIES Defendant's Ex Parte Application to file a motion to dismiss exceeding twenty pages. The Defendant and Plaintiff are ORDERED to comply with this court's standing order with respect to page limits. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY in support of #14 Ex Parte Application by Kim Embry, Noam Glick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Schulte, Jake) Modified on 4/24/2020 (Huang, H).
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 OPPOSITION to #14 Ex Parte Application by Plaintiff B&G Foods North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hagey, J.) Modified on 4/22/2020 (Huang, H).
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Permitting Filing of Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Exceeding 20 Pages by Kim Embry, Noam Glick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Schulte, Jake) Modified on 4/22/2020 (Huang, H).
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Shaun Andrew Markley on behalf of Kim Embry, Noam Glick. Attorney Markley, Shaun Andrew added. (Markley, Shaun)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jake W. Schulte on behalf of Kim Embry, Noam Glick. Attorney Schulte, Jake W. added. (Schulte, Jake)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Noam Glick for Kim Embry,Noam Glick for Noam Glick. (Glick, Noam)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to TRANSFER VENUE by B&G Foods North America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Scott Lerner, #3 Declaration of David H. Kwasniewski, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7)(Hagey, J.) Modified on 4/7/2020 (Reader, L).
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Noam Glick served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Hagey, J.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kim Embry served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. (Hagey, J.)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/2020 GRANTING the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #6 ). Accordingly, the defendants are ORDERED to file their Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) by 5/1/2020; the plaintiff is ORDERED to file its Opposition by 6/1/2020; and the defendants are ORDERED to file their Reply by 6/15/2020. Further, the defendant's are ORDERED to notice their forthcoming Motion to Dismiss for hearing on 7/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Michel, G.)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER re #1 Complaint by Kim Embry, Noam Glick. Attorney Nicholas, Craig M. added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nicholas, Craig) Modified on 3/27/2020 (Zignago, K.).
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff B&G Foods North America, Inc.. (Hagey, J.)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Constitutional Challenge of Statute Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.1 by B&G Foods North America, Inc.. (Hagey, J.)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Zignago, K.)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kim Embry, Noam Glick* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *J. Noah Hagey, Esq.* *Braunhagey & Borden LLP* *351 California Street, 10th Floor* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Zignago, K.)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by B&G Foods North America, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8781614) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hagey, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B&G Foods North America, Inc. v. Embry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noam Glick
Represented By: Noam Glick
Represented By: Craig M. Nicholas
Represented By: Jake W. Schulte
Represented By: Shaun Andrew Markley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Embry
Represented By: Noam Glick
Represented By: Craig M. Nicholas
Represented By: Jake W. Schulte
Represented By: Shaun Andrew Markley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&G Foods North America, Inc.
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: David Howard Kwasniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?