(HC) Edwards v. Pleasant Valley State Prison et al
Petitioner: Jason Claude Edwards
Respondent: Pleasant Valley State Prison and Solano County Superior Court
Case Number: 2:2020cv00530
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/25/2020. Consent or Decline due by 4/27/2020. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
March 25, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Jason Claude Edwards. (Henshaw, R)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/25/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order; and ORDERING Petitioner to file a current signature page attesting to the fact that he desires his current signature on the signature page to be appended to, and incorporated into, the petition within 20 days from the filed date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jason Claude Edwards. (Coll, A)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Jason Claude Edwards, CDC AU-8627 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
March 10, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Jason Claude Edwards. (York, M)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED;: Consent or Decline due by 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (York, M)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jason Claude Edwards. (York, M)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against All Respondents by Jason Claude Edwards.(York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Edwards v. Pleasant Valley State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pleasant Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Solano County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Claude Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?