The GEO Group, Inc. v. Newsom et al
Plaintiff: The GEO Group, Inc.
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Gavin C. Newsom
Case Number: 2:2020cv00533
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/2020 EXTENDING deadlines as follows: Defendants' response to #1 Complaint due by 5/28/2020, Defendants' combined Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 5/28/2020, Plaintiff's combined Reply in support of #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due by 6/11/2020, Defendants' Reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss due by 6/25/2020, and both Motions shall be heard on 8/20/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Huang, H)
May 6, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS AND BRIEFING DATES AND TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by The GEO Group, Inc.. (Schlecht, Chanmaly)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/25/2020 EXTENDING Defendants' deadline to respond to #1 Complaint to 5/14/2020 and ORDERING that Defendants shall file a combined Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 5/14/2020. Plaintiff shall file a combined Reply in support of #16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 5/28/2020. Defendants shall file a Reply Brief in support of their Motion to Dismiss by 6/4/2020. Both Motions shall be heard on 6/11/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Huang, H)
March 25, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuation of Hearing and to Extend Deadlines by Xavier Becerra, Gavin C. Newsom. Attorney Boutin, Gabrielle Downey added. (Boutin, Gabrielle) Modified on 3/26/2020 (Coll, A).
March 19, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (McClellan, Michael)
March 19, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Gavin C. Newsom served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (McClellan, Michael)
March 16, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by The GEO Group, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Amber Martin, #3 Declaration of Richard Long, #4 Declaration of C. Kendie Schlecht, #5 Appendix of Exhibits, #6 Proposed Order)(McClellan, Michael) Modified on 3/17/2020 (Coll, A).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 03/12/20 DECLINING to #4 Relate cases. This Order is issued for informational purposes only and shall have no effect on the status of the cases, including any previous Related (or Non-Related) Case Order of this court. (Benson, A.)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/11/20. Added attorney Steven J. Lindsay, PHV for The GEO Group, Inc. (Benson, A.)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/11/20. Added attorney Michael W. Kirk, PHV for The GEO Group, Inc. (Benson, A.)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/11/20: Added attorney Charles J. Cooper, PHV for The GEO Group, Inc.. (Kaminski, H)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/11/20: Added attorney Jose Joel Alicea, PHV for The GEO Group, Inc. (Kaminski, H)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/10/2020: Pursuant to Local Rule 123, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file the Notice of Related Cases in all cases listed in connection with the Notice of Related Cases (ECF No. #4 ), within seven (7) days of this Minute Order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by The GEO Group, Inc. for attorney Steven J. Lindsay to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8785892) (McClellan, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by The GEO Group, Inc. for attorney Jose J. Alicea to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8785879) (McClellan, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by The GEO Group, Inc. for attorney Michael W. Kirk to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8785871) (McClellan, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by The GEO Group, Inc. for attorney Charles J. Cooper to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8785848) (McClellan, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Chanmaly Kendie Schlecht on behalf of The GEO Group, Inc.. Attorney Schlecht, Chanmaly Kendie added. (Schlecht, Chanmaly)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:18-cv-721- WBS-DB by The GEO Group, Inc.. (McClellan, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, Gavin C. Newsom* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Brandon McClellan* *895 Dove Street* *Fifth Floor* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Coll, A)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINTagainst Xavier Becerra, Gavin C. Newsom by The GEO Group, Inc. Attorney McClellan, Michael Brandon added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8783585) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Related Case)(McClellan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The GEO Group, Inc. v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Gabrielle Downey Boutin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin C. Newsom
Represented By: Gabrielle Downey Boutin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The GEO Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brandon McClellan
Represented By: Chanmaly Kendie Schlecht
Represented By: Jose Joel Alicea, PHV
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk, PHV
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper, PHV
Represented By: Steven J. Lindsay, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?