Williams v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Williams
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Nathan D. Daniel, City of Rancho Cordova, Joseph Zalec and Derek Hutchins
Case Number: 2:2020cv00598
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
2 Judge: Kendall J Newman
3 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Sacramento served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Zienty, Scott)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Huang, H)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/7/2020 ORDERING that this case be related to case number 2:19-cv-02345-TLN-KJN and REASSIGNING this case to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The caption shall read 2:20-cv-00598-TLN-KJN. Any dates currently set in 2:20-cv-00598-KJM-DB are hereby VACATED, and the parties are ORDERED to refile any pending motions before this Court. The Clerk of the Court is to issue the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes no longer assigned to case. (Huang, H)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:19-cv-02345-TLN-KJN by Thomas Williams. (Zienty, Scott)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Kaminski, H)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Rancho Cordova, County of Sacramento, Nathan D. Daniel, Derek Hutchins, Joseph Zalec* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Scott C. Zienty* *Bohm Law Group* *4600 Northgate Blvd., Suite 210* *Sacramento, CA 95834*. (Kaminski, H)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Rancho Cordova, County of Sacramento, Nathan D. Daniel, Derek Hutchins, Joseph Zalec by Thomas Williams. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8801663) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet. (Zienty, Scott).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan D. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rancho Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Zalec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Williams
Represented By: Daniel Todd Newman
Represented By: Scott C. Zienty
Represented By: Gregory R. Davenport
Represented By: Lawrance A. Bohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?