(SS) Hadzic v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Zekerjah Hadzic
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00640
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Forslund, Jacqueline)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (McAdam, S.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/29/2020. (Tupolo, A)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Zekerjah Hadzic pursuant to order of the court. (Forslund, Jacqueline)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/16/2020: The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, Paragraphs 6, 10. (Streeter, J)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 7/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Zignago, K.)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jacqueline Anna Forslund* *Forslund Law LLC* *P.O. Box 4476* *Sunriver, OR 97707*. (Zignago, K.)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/13/2020 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk is directed to serve scheduling order in social security cases. Within fourteen days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the United States Marshal and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days. (Zignago, K.)
March 25, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Huang, H)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Zekerjah Hadzic. (Forslund, Jacqueline)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Zekerjah Hadzic. Attorney Forslund, Jacqueline Anna added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forslund, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Hadzic v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: S. Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zekerjah Hadzic
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?