(PS) Ferrantino v. Baradat Properties
Plaintiff: Anthony Ferrantino
Defendant: Baradat Properties
Case Number: 2:2020cv00666
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Anthony Ferrantino pursuant to order of the court. (Coll, A)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Baradat Properties by Anthony Ferrantino. (Coll, A)
May 13, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Amended Civil New Case Documents for TLN served on Anthony Ferrantino. (Coll, A)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Coll, A)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 [DISREGARD - See #6 Amended Civil New Case Documents] CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Coll, A) Modified on 5/13/2020 (Coll, A).
May 13, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Summons served on Anthony Ferrantino. (Coll, A)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Baradat Properties* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony Ferrantino* *1331 Crane Street* *Apt. 402* *Menlo Park, CA 94025*. (Coll, A)
May 13, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, #4 Summons, #5 New Cases Documents and a copy of the #1 Complaint and 1 USM-285 Form served on Anthony Ferrantino. (Coll, A) Modified on 5/13/2020 (Benson, A.).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/13/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING plaintiff to complete and submit Service Documents and USM-285 form. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Form, 1 Instruction Sheet and 1 copy of the #1 Complaint. Plaintiff shall supply the USM with the documents needed to effect service of process within 14 days and shall file a statement with the court that documents have been submitted to the USM. (Coll, A)
March 31, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (York, M)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anthony Ferrantino. (York, M)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baradat Properties by Anthony Ferrantino. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Ferrantino v. Baradat Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baradat Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ferrantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?