Kirchenberg v. Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erin Kirchenberg
Defendant: Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc. and J.M. Smucker Co.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00690
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 17 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc., J.M. Smucker Co. for attorney Sean H. Suber to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8898306) (Rothstein, Ronald)
May 19, 2020 Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc., J.M. Smucker Co. for attorney Ronald Y. Rothstein to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Rothstein, Ronald Y. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8898278) (Rothstein, Ronald)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Jereige, Amanda) Modified on 5/18/2020 (Zignago, K.).
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J.M. Smucker Co. (Jereige, Amanda) Modified on 5/18/2020 (Zignago, K.).
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Amanda Jereige on behalf of Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc., J.M. Smucker Co.. Attorney Jereige, Amanda added. (Jereige, Amanda)
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/29/20: Added attorney Arthur M. Stock, PHV for Erin Kirchenberg. (Kaminski, H)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/29/20: Added attorney Lisa A. White, PHV for Erin Kirchenberg. (Kaminski, H)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Erin Kirchenberg for attorney Arthur Stock to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8864091) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Arthur Stock)(Straus, Alex)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Erin Kirchenberg for attorney Lisa A. White to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8864070) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Lisa A. White)(Straus, Alex)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to J.M. Smucker Co. on 4/7/2020, Answer due 6/8/2020 (Straus, Alex)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc. on 4/7/2020, Answer due 6/8/2020 (Straus, Alex)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Pine for Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. This matter is set for Status (Initial Scheduling) on 8/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Redding (DMC) before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiff shall serve this minute order on defendants not yet appearing. (Pine, C)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ORDERING this matter REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for pretrial scheduling. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 8/6/2020 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED, and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this minute order on Defendants not yet appearing. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc., J.M. Smucker Co.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alex R. Straus* *Greg Coleman Law, PC* *16748 McCormack Street* *Los Angeles, California 91436*. (Reader, L)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Erin Kirchenberg (Straus, Alex)
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc., J.M. Smucker Co. by Erin Kirchenberg. Attorney Straus, Alex Rafael added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8826624) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Testing, #2 Exhibit B Demand Letters)(Straus, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirchenberg v. Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ainsworth Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Y. Rothstein, PHV
Represented By: Amanda Jereige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Smucker Co.
Represented By: Ronald Y. Rothstein, PHV
Represented By: Amanda Jereige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Kirchenberg
Represented By: Alex Rafael Straus
Represented By: Arthur M. Stock, PHV
Represented By: Lisa A. White, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?