(PC) McDonald v. Bickle, et al
Plaintiff: Calvin B. McDonald, Jr.
Defendant: E. Barkiewicz, J. Atnip, J. Bickle, S. Lor, T. Brinigar, N. Baillie, J. Rojas and A. Jenkins
Case Number: 2:2020cv00766
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order served on Calvin B. McDonald Jr. (Huang, H)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/29/2020 ADOPTING #5 Findings and Recommendations in full, DISMISSING Claim Three without leave to amend, and TERMINATING J. Atnip and T. Brinigar as defendants. This action proceeds on Claims One and Two of #1 Complaint, as construed to allege excessive force in violation of the Eighth Amendment. (Huang, H)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INTENT TO WAIVE SERVICE by defendant(s) A. Jenkins, J. Bickle, E. Barkiewicz, J. Rojas S. Lor, N. Baillie. AG Waiver of Service due in 30 days. (Reader, L)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tupolo, A)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *N. Baillie, E. Barkiewicz, J. Bickle, A. Jenkins, S. Lor, J. Rojas* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Calvin B. McDonald, Jr. AB3824* *MULE CREEK STATE PRISON (409060)* *PO BOX 409060* *IONE, CA 95640*. (Henshaw, R)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/22/2020. Consent or Decline due by 5/26/2020. (Henshaw, R)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
April 22, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment and #5 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Calvin B. McDonald Jr. (Henshaw, R)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/21/2020 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Calvin B. McDonald, Jr. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/21/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDERING Clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this action; FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendants: *A. Jenkins*, *J. Bickle*,*E. Barkiewicz*,*J. Rojas*, *S. Lor*, and *N. Baillie*; and RECOMMENDING Claim 3 be dismissed without leave to amend, J. Atnip and T. Brinigar be terminated as defendants, and this action proceed on Claims 1 and 2 of the complaint, as construed to allege excessive force in violation of the 8th Amendment. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver, Order re Consent, and this Order served via email on CDCR. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00. All fees to be collected and paid in accordance with this court' order to the CDCR filed concurrently herewith. (Attachments: #1 CDCR Notice of Waiver) (Henshaw, R)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-0766 TLN AC (PC). (Henshaw, R)
April 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL and EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Calvin B. McDonald Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/14/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 5/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kaminski, H)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Calvin B. McDonald, Jr. (Kaminski, H)
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Calvin B. McDonald, Jr. #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaminski, H).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) McDonald v. Bickle, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Barkiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Atnip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Brinigar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin B. McDonald, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?