(PC) Overton v. California Health Care Facility
Plaintiff: Michael L. Overton
Defendant: California Health Care Facility
Case Number: 2:2020cv00854
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Becknal, R)
May 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order and IFP application served on Michael L. Overton. (Henshaw, R)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/5/2020 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP on the form provided by the Clerk or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. (Henshaw, R)
April 27, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael L. Overton. (Flores, E)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Flores, E)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01579.
April 24, 2020 Transferring case electronically to the Eastern District of California. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/27/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/14/2020. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/27/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 Mail returned as undeliverable re #2 Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form, #3 Clerk's Notice re: IFP. Mail Returned; response required by 5/18/2020. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/27/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/10/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/27/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: Complaint on Form due by 4/10/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/27/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Health Care Facility. Filed by Michael L. Overton. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020) [Transferred from cand on 4/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Overton v. California Health Care Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Health Care Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?