Carrillo v. Tenet Healthcare Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Carrillo
Defendant: Doctors Hospital of Manteca, Inc. and Tenet Healthcare Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv00865
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/20/2020 APPROVING #4 Stipulation and DISMISSING Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party bearing that own party's attorney's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION of DIsmissal and Order of Dismissal by Jesus Carrillo. (Tabak, Stewart) Modified on 5/21/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Doctors Hospital of Manteca, Inc., Tenet Healthcare Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stewart M. Tabak* *Tabak Law Firm* *250 Dorris Place* *Stockton, CA 95204*. (Benson, A.)
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jesus Carrillo. Attorney Tabak, Stewart M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8865198) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tabak, Stewart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrillo v. Tenet Healthcare Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctors Hospital of Manteca, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenet Healthcare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Carrillo
Represented By: Stewart M. Tabak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?