Cannon v. Wellpath Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aisling Cannon
Defendant: Wellpath Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00925
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Wellpath Management, Inc. (Khangura, Simerdip)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER by Wellpath Management, Inc. (Khangura, Simerdip)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 [DISREGARD - Counsel to Refile] CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Wellpath Management, Inc. (Khangura, Simerdip) Modified on 6/30/2020 (Huang, H).
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 [DISREGARD - Counsel to Refile] ANSWER by Wellpath Management, Inc.(Khangura, Simerdip) Modified on 6/30/2020 (Huang, H).
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Wellpath Management, Inc.. Attorney Khangura, Simerdip added. (Khangura, Simerdip)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Wellpath Management, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David J. Graulich* *Law Practice of David Graulich* *4727 Meadowood Way* *Fair Oaks, CA 95628*. (Benson, A.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wellpath Management, Inc. by Aisling Cannon. Attorney Graulich, David J. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8877593) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Graulich, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. Wellpath Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aisling Cannon
Represented By: David J. Graulich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?