Castro v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Martha Castro
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00928
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Walmart Inc. re #9 Motion to Dismiss. (Peracchio, Paloma)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by Walmart Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Peracchio, Paloma) Modified on 6/8/2020 (Kaminski, H).
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc. by Martha Castro.(Bradley, Marcus)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Paloma Peracchio re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Peracchio, Paloma)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/8/2020 GRANTING plaintiff until 5/22/2020 to file a First Amended Complaint with defendant's response due 14 days of its filing. (Coll, A)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mitchell A. Wrosch on behalf of Walmart Inc.. Attorney Wrosch, Mitchell A. added. (Wrosch, Mitchell)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to file First Amended Complaint by Walmart Inc.. (Peracchio, Paloma) Modified on 5/11/2020 (Kaminski, H).
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Walmart Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Peracchio, Paloma)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Placer County Superior Court, case number S-CV-0044650 by Walmart Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8878517) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Paloma Peracchio, #5 Declaration of Cephonie Jackson, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Peracchio, Paloma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Paloma P. Peracchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Castro
Represented By: Marcus J. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?