Weaver, et al v. City of Stockton, et al.,
Plaintiff: James Weaver, Jr., J. W., III, J. W., James Weaver, Sr. and L. W.
Defendant: City of Stockton, Eric Jones, Stockton Police Department and Kevin Jaye Hachler
Case Number: 2:2020cv00990
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to STRIKE #1 Complaint by City of Stockton, Kevin Jaye Hachler, Eric Jones, Stockton Police Department. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jamil R. Ghannam).(Ghannam, Jamil) Modified on 7/10/2020 (Kaminski, H).
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by City of Stockton, Kevin Jaye Hachler, Eric Jones, Stockton Police Department. Attorney Ghannam, Jamil Radwan added. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities)(Ghannam, Jamil) Modified on 7/10/2020 (Kaminski, H).
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Stockton, Kevin Jaye Hachler, Eric Jones, Stockton Police Department* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Yolanda Huang* *Law Office of Yolanda Huang* *528 Grand Avenue* *Oakland, CA 94610*. (Benson, A.)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by James Weaver. Attorney Huang, Yolanda added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8893463) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huang, Yolanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver, et al v. City of Stockton, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Weaver, Jr.
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. W., III
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. W.
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Weaver, Sr.
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. W.
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Stockton
Represented By: Jamil Radwan Ghannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Jones
Represented By: Jamil Radwan Ghannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stockton Police Department
Represented By: Jamil Radwan Ghannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Jaye Hachler
Represented By: Jamil Radwan Ghannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?