(PC) Joshua S. Hill v. Warden
Plaintiff: Joshua Spencer Hill
Defendant: Warden
Case Number: 2:2020cv01033
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Joshua Spencer Hill. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-03326.
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/20/2020. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 5/21/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/22/2020. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 5/21/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joshua Spencer Hill. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 5/21/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Warden. Filed by Joshua Spencer Hill. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020) [Transferred from cand on 5/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Joshua S. Hill v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Spencer Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?