Akkawi et al v. Sadr et al
Plaintiff: Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian, Katelyn J. Button, Diana Akkawi and Yasmin Akkawi
Defendant: Kasra Sadr, California Department of Motor Vehicles, Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, The Sadr Law Firm, Ryan Bancaya, Sadr Law Firm, Narissa Nelson and Nima Heydari
Not Classified By Court: The Mailing Group, Inc. and Mailing Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01034
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Filing 191 SUPPLEMENT by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James)
August 29, 2023 Filing 190 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added Attorney Alexis Ann Jugan for Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian, Attorney Dixon Leon Gardner terminated. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 8/30/2023 (Kastilahn, A).
August 28, 2023 Filing 189 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/28/2023 re #130 Motion for Sanctions. On the courts own motion an oral argument hearing has been set for September 20, 2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, September 20, 2023 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. Any opposition to the #130 Motion for Sanctions is due by September 13, 2023. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
August 28, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 189 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Anderson, J)
August 21, 2023 Filing 188 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Ryan Bancaya* (Reader, L)
August 11, 2023 Filing 187 REQUEST to Enter Default for Ryan Bancaya by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian re #186 Memorandum and Order. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 8/21/2023 (Reader, L).
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/11/23 ORDERING that [171-72] Plaintiffs' Motions for Alternative Service are each GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Not later than seven (7) days from the issuance of this Memorandum and Order, Plaintiffs shall serve Heydari and Nelson a copy of the subpoena and a copy of this Memorandum and Order by mail delivery to their residences and office only. The Order to Show Cause 183 is DISCHARGED. Plaintiffs' #140 Administrative Motion for an Order Vacating the Current Discovery Cut-off is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Discovery is reopened for 90 days for the following limited purposes only: (a) serve subpoenas on and conduct depositions of Heydari and Nelson and (b) obtain discovery from Bancaya. Sadr Defendants' #137 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. The stay imposed on 4/5/23, ECF No. #175 , is LIFTED. (Kastilahn, A)
August 11, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #186 Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Kastilahn, A)
July 28, 2023 Filing 185 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Kasra Sadr to #184 Response to Order to Show Cause,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
July 24, 2023 Filing 184 RESPONSE to 183 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 7/25/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 14, 2023 Filing 183 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Not later than ten (10) days from the issuance of this minute order, Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause in writing as to whether Defendant Ryan Bancaya was properly served in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(f) and the Hague Convention. Failure to timely comply with this order to show cause will result in the imposition of sanctions without further notice. (Deutsch, S)
July 14, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 183 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Deutsch, S)
June 5, 2023 Filing 182 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss at ECF No. #107 is TERMINATED. See ECF No. #137 at 2. Counsel is cautioned that, in the future, they must file a proper notice of withdrawal of motion, and that any further violations of federal or local rules of court will result in sanctions of the offending party, in an amount reportable to the State Bar of California, without further notice. (Deutsch, S)
June 5, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 182 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Deutsch, S)
May 5, 2023 Filing 181 REPLY to #172 Motion for Service by Publication by Diana Akkawi et al,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 5/8/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
May 5, 2023 Filing 180 REPLY TO #171 Motion for Service by Publication by Diana Akkawi, et al,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 5/8/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
May 1, 2023 Filing 179 OPPOSITION by Narissa Nelson to #172 Motion for Service by Publication,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
May 1, 2023 Filing 178 OPPOSITION by Nima Heydari to #171 Motion for Service by Publication,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
April 12, 2023 Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion, any oppositions to ECF Nos. #171 and #172 are to be filed not later than 4/28/2023, and replies if any, not later than 5/5/2023. These motions remain SUBMITTED without argument or hearing. (Deutsch, S)
April 12, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 177 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Deutsch, S)
April 10, 2023 Filing 176 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/10/2023: In light of the order staying this case (ECF No. #175 ), the hearing on plaintiffs' motion for sanctions (ECF No. #130 ) set for 4/12/2023 is VACATED to be re-set if necessary. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J) Modified on 4/11/2023 (Anderson, J).
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/05/23 DENYING #31 Stipulation and Proposed Order for failing to comply with Local Rule 137(b); STRIKING #174 Motion to Dismiss as improperly filed; REINSTATING fully briefed #107 Motion to Dismiss which REMAINS SUBMITTED before the Court; SUBMITTING without oral argument #171 #172 Motions for Alternative Service and VACATING any hearing dates for these motions; #137 Motion for Summary Judgment and #140 Motion to Vacate REMAIN SUBMITTED without hearing; STAYING CASE in its entirety and VACATING all hearings, due dates, and deadlines set before Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. No further motions will be considered by this Court until such time as orders resolving the parties' currently submitted motions are filed. If necessary, the Court will issue an amended pretrial scheduling order. (Benson, A.)
April 5, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #175 Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Benson, A.)
March 30, 2023 Filing 174 [STRICKEN PER #175 ORDER] AMENDED #107 MOTION to DISMISS by Car Law Firm, Kasra Sadr, Sadr Law Firm. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 3/30/2023 (Benson, A.). Modified on 4/5/2023 (Benson, A.).
March 29, 2023 Filing 173 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy M. Woodworth for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/29/23. On the court's own motion, an oral argument hearing regarding plaintiffs #130 Motion for Sanctions has been set for 04/12/2023 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before the Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The parties are to contact the Court Clerk at (916) 930-4199 or janderson@caed.uscourts.gov one week prior to the hearing in order to obtain the Zoom I/D and the Password. (Text Only Entry)(Woodworth, M.)
March 29, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 173 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Woodworth, M.)
March 27, 2023 Filing 172 MOTION for ALTERNATIVE SERVICE of Non-Party Narissa Nelson by Diana Akkawi, et al., Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 3/28/2023 (Benson, A.).
March 27, 2023 Filing 171 MOTION for ALTERNATIVE SERVICE of Non-Party Nima Heydari by Diana Akkawi, et al., Tarverdian. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 3/28/2023 (Benson, A.).
March 24, 2023 Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion, ECF Nos. #154 and #161 are DENIED as MOOT, and the Minute Orders at ECF Nos. 155 and 162 are to be DISREGARDED as docketed in error. The Motion for Alternative Service of Non-Party Narissa Nelson and the Motion for Alternative Service of Non-Party Nima Heydari are to be REFILED in their entirety before Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on May 4, 2023, at 10:00 am, in courtroom 7. The Clerk's Office is directed to make the applicable updates to the case docket pursuant to this minute order. (Deutsch, S)
March 24, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 170 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Deutsch, S)
March 20, 2023 Filing 169 OPPOSITION by Narissa Nelson to #154 Motion for Service by Publication,. (Sadr, Kasra)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/17/2023 DENYING #138 Motion to Compel without prejudice to a motion brought in the proper district. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 17, 2023 Filing 167 NOTICE of ERRATA by All Plaintiffs re #161 Motion for Alternative Service: Heydari.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James)
March 17, 2023 Filing 166 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion, ECF Nos. #164 and #165 are STRICKED as duplicative to the filings at ECF Nos. #154 and #161 . Accordingly, the 4/20/2023 motions hearing is VACATED. (Deutsch, S)
March 17, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 166 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Deutsch, S)
March 17, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #168 Order on Motion to Compel, served on Narissa Nelson. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 16, 2023 Filing 165 MOTION for ALTERNATIVE SERVICE of Non-Party Narissa Nelson by Diana Akkawi, et al., Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 3/17/2023 (Benson, A.).
March 16, 2023 Filing 164 MOTION for ALTERNATIVE SERVICE of Non-Party Nima Heydari by Diana Akkawi, et al. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 3/17/2023 (Benson, A.).
March 16, 2023 Filing 163 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Diana Akkawi, et al., to #160 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 3/17/2023 (Benson, A.).
March 16, 2023 Filing 162 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/16/2023 re #161 Motion for Service by Publication. The hearing on the motions now calendared for Wednesday, April 19, 2023 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
March 15, 2023 Filing 161 MOTION for ALTERNATIVE SERVICE of Non-Party Nima Heydari by Diana Akkawi, et al., Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 3/16/2023 (Benson, A.).
March 15, 2023 Filing 160 SUPPLEMENTAL #147 OPPOSITION by Kasra Sadr to #130 Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 3/15/2023 (Benson, A.).
March 14, 2023 Filing 159 REPLY by Kasra Sadr in support of #137 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Objection Letter, #2 Notice 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 3/15/2023 (Benson, A.).
March 14, 2023 Filing 158 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT DECLINED as to Ryan Bancaya. The clerk hereby declines to enter #156 Request for Entry of Default filed by Kasra Sadr due to defendant Ryan Bancaya is a resident of a foreign country whose 90 day response time has not yet expired. (TEXT ONLY) (Benson, A.)
March 14, 2023 Filing 157 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/14/2023 re #138 Motion to Compel. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, March 15, 2023 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly (Text Only Entry) (Anderson, J)
March 14, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 157 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Anderson, J)
March 13, 2023 Filing 156 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ryan Bancaya by Kasra Sadr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
March 13, 2023 Filing 155 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/13/2023 re #154 Motion for Service by Publication. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, April 19, 2023 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
March 13, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 155 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Anderson, J)
March 10, 2023 Filing 154 MOTION for ALTERNATIVE SERVICE of Non-Party Narissa Nelson by Diana Akkawi, et al., Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 3/13/2023 (Benson, A.).
March 9, 2023 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Plaintiffs re #152 Reply. (Sifers, James) Modified on 3/10/2023 (Perdue, C.).
March 9, 2023 Filing 152 REPLY by Plaintiffs re #147 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Sifers, James) Modified on 3/10/2023 (Perdue, C.).
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/09/2023 DENYING #135 Motion to Compel. No fees or sanctions are ordered. (Rodriguez, E)
March 9, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #151 Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Rodriguez, E)
March 6, 2023 Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/06/2023 re #135 Motion to Compel. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, March 8, 2023 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry) (Anderson, J)
March 6, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 150 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Anderson, J)
March 2, 2023 Filing 149 OPPOSITION by Diana Akkawi, et al to #137 Motion for Summary Judgment. Attorney Sifers, James Steven added. (Attachments: #1 Opposition, #2 Declaration of Larry Steven, #3 Declaration of James Sifers, #4 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 3/3/2023 (Rodriguez, E).
March 1, 2023 Filing 148 OPPOSITION by Kasra Sadr to #140 Motion to Vacate. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
February 27, 2023 Filing 147 OPPOSITION by Kasra Sadr to #130 Motion for Sanctions,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
February 27, 2023 Filing 146 OPPOSITION by Kasra Sadr to #135 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
February 23, 2023 Filing 145 JOINT STATEMENT of Joint Statement regarding Discovery Disagreements in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Orders Compelling David Eisenberg filed by Plaintiffs Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
February 22, 2023 Filing 144 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel #134 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 2/23/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 22, 2023 Filing 143 AFFIDAVIT of James S. Sifers regarding Joint Statement regarding discovery disagreements re #135 Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 2/23/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 22, 2023 Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/22/2023 re #135 Motion to Compel. After review of the #134 Motion to Compel, the motion is now moot per #135 Motion to Compel.(Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
February 22, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 142 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Anderson, J)
February 17, 2023 Filing 141 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Notice of Administrative Motion and Administrative Motion for an Order Vacating the Current Discovery Cut-off #140 . The motion is deficiently filed without a hearing date pursuant to Local Rule 230. Accordingly, the motion is set on 3/23/2023, the hearing is VACATED, and the motion is SUBMITTED pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230(c)-(d). If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. (Deutsch, S)
February 17, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 141 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Deutsch, S)
February 16, 2023 Filing 140 MOTION to VACATE the Current Discovery Cut-Off by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 2/17/2023 (Perdue, C.).
February 16, 2023 Filing 139 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 3/23/2023 hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment #137 is VACATED and the motion is SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 230(c)-(d). If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. (Deutsch, S)
February 16, 2023 Filing 138 MOTION to COMPEL David Eisenberg to Comply with Subpoena; To Hold David Eisenberg in Contempt For an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs in the Amount of $4,500.00 by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 2/17/2023 (Perdue, C.).
February 16, 2023 Filing 137 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr, Sadr Law Firm. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions, #3 Declaration of Kasra Sadr, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 2/17/2023 (Perdue, C.).
February 16, 2023 Filing 136 MOTION to COMPEL David Eisenberg to Comply with Subpoena; To Hold David Eisenberg in Contempt For an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs in the Amount of $4,500.00 by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 2/17/2023 (Perdue, C.).
February 15, 2023 Filing 135 AMENDED #134 MOTION to COMPEL Responses to Plaintiff Diana Akkawi's Interrogatories, Set Two and Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two For an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs in the Amount of $4,500.00 by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 2/16/2023 (Perdue, C.).
February 15, 2023 Filing 134 MOTION to COMPEL Responses to Plaintiff Diana Akkawi's Interrogatories, Set Two and Requests for Production of Documents, Set Two For an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs in the Amount of $4,500.00 by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 2/16/2023 (Perdue, C.).
February 15, 2023 Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/15/2023 re #132 Motion to Vacate. Pursuant to Local Rules 230 and 302, #132 Motion to Vacate is deficiently noticed. Plaintiff is hereby directed to re-notice the #132 Motion to Vacate before the assigned District Judge. Please contact the courtroom deputy, Stephanie Deutsch, at sdeutsch@caed.uscourts.gov to obtain a motion hearing date. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
February 15, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 133 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Anderson, J)
February 14, 2023 Filing 132 MOTION to VACATE Current Discovery Cut-Off by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 2/15/2023 (Perdue, C.).
February 13, 2023 Filing 131 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/13/2023 re #130 Motion for Sanctions. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, March 22, 2023 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry) (Anderson, J)
February 10, 2023 Filing 130 MOTION for SANCTIONS; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of James S. Sifers by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing SET for 3/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 2/13/2023 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/8/2023 GRANTING #123 Motion to Compel. Defendant shall produce all responsive documents to RFPs 1-29 within 15 days of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 9, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #129 Order on Motion to Compel served on Narissa Nelson. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 8, 2023 Filing 128 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ryan Bancaya served on 2/7/2023, answer due 2/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
February 8, 2023 Filing 127 MINUTES for MOTION HEARING proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire held on 2/8/2023 re #123 Motion to Compel. All parties present. Argument heard as to the pending #123 Motion to Compel. Matter submitted. Court order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel James Sifers present. Defendants Counsel Kasra Sadr present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Anderson, J)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/02/23 DENYING #125 Stipulation to continue hearing. If plaintiffs wish to forego their right to having the pending motion to compel heard, they may withdraw it. Any counsel that does not appear for the Zoom hearing on February 8, 2023 at 10:00 a.m.before the undersigned--or make arrangements for alternative counsel to specially appear on behalf of their client, prepared to argue the motion--will be subject to monetary sanctions to be paid directly by counsel in an amount the court deems appropriate.(Licea Chavez, V)
February 3, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #126 Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Licea Chavez, V)
February 1, 2023 Filing 125 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Hearing on #123 Motion to Compel by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation for Continuance of Hearing, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 2/2/2023 (Rodriguez, E).
January 30, 2023 Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/30/2023 re #123 Motion to Compel. On the Courts own motion, the #123 Motion to Compel currently scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET 2/8/2023 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The parties are to contact the Court Clerk at (916) 930-4199 or janderson@caed.uscourts.gov one day prior to the hearing in order to obtain the Zoom I/D and the Password. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
January 30, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 124 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Anderson, J)
January 27, 2023 Filing 123 MOTION to COMPEL Responses to Requests for Production of Documents at Deposition of Defendant Kasra Sadr by Diana Akkawi, et al.. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Joint Statement , #2 Declarations of James Sifers and Dixon Gardner, #3 Exhibit 100, #4 Exhibit 101, #5 Exhibit 102, #6 Exhibit 103, #7 Exhibit 104, #8 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 1/30/2023 (Kastilahn, A).
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/15/22 GRANTING #108 & #110 Motion to Quash and DENYING AS MOOT #112 Motion to Quash. (Licea Chavez, V)
December 15, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #122 Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Licea Chavez, V)
December 2, 2022 Filing 121 REPLY by Nima Heydari re #117 Opposition to Motion. (Sadr, Kasra)
November 16, 2022 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Susanna F. Wiseman re #119 Notice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 11/17/2022 (Kaminski, H).
November 15, 2022 Filing 119 NOTICE of Non-Service of Response to Motion to Quash Subpoena by Narissa Nelson re #108 Motion to Quash. (Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 11/16/2022 (Kaminski, H).
November 9, 2022 Filing 118 REPLY by Kasra Sadr re #115 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
November 9, 2022 Filing 117 OPPOSITION by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian to #110 Motion to Quash, #112 Motion to Quash. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
November 3, 2022 Filing 116 OPPOSITION by Diana Akkawi, et al., to #108 Motion to Quash. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) .
November 1, 2022 Filing 115 OPPOSITION by Diana Akkawi, et al., to #107 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
October 28, 2022 Filing 114 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 12/1/2022 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #107 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the hearing date (see Local Rule 230(c)-(d)). If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
October 28, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: 114 Minute Order served on Narissa Nelson. (Deutsch, S)
October 27, 2022 Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/27/2022 re #112 Motion to Quash. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, December 7, 2022 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
October 27, 2022 Filing 112 MOTION to QUASH Civil Supoena or, Alternative Motion for Protective Order by Nima Heydari. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 10/27/2022 (Reader, L).
October 27, 2022 Filing 111 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/27/2022 re #110 Motion to Quash. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, December 7, 2022 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry) (Anderson, J)
October 26, 2022 Filing 110 MOTION to QUASH Civil Supoena or, Alternative Motion for Protective Order by Nima Heydari. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Sadr, Kasra)
October 21, 2022 Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/21/2022 re #108 Motion to Quash. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, November 30, 2022 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
October 20, 2022 Filing 108 MOTION to QUASH Civil Subpoena; or Alternative Motion for Protected Order by Narissa Nelson. Motion Hearing SET for 11/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 10/21/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 18, 2022 Filing 107 MOTION to DISMISS by Kasra Sadr. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 10/18/2022 (Reader, L).
October 18, 2022 Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/18/2022 re #105 Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Local Rules 230, #105 Motion to Dismiss is deficiently noticed. Defendant is hereby directed to re-notice the #105 Motion to Dismiss before the assigned Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr. (Text Only Entry) (Anderson, J)
October 17, 2022 Filing 105 MOTION to DISMISS and Proposed Order by Kasra Sadr. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 10/17/2022 (Reader, L).
September 29, 2022 Filing 104 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ryan Bancaya* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James Steven Sifers* *Madison Law, APC* *17702 Mitchell North* *Irvine, CA 92614*. (Rodriguez, E)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/26/2022 GRANTING #65 Motion to Compel, and DENYING #78 Motion for Protective Order. The Mailing Group is hereby ORDERED to respond fully to the subpoena within 5 days of this order. (Reader, L)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/26/2022 STRIKING #92 as duplicative, Motion to Set Aside. GRANTING #90 Motion to compel responses to requests for production of documents not produced by defendant Nationwide VIN Marketing at its deposition. All responsive documents shall be produced within 10 days of this order. GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART Plaintiffs' #91 motion to compel responses to questions not answered by defendant Kasra Sadr for himself and for defendant VIN Marketing at his deposition. GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART #93 Plaintiffs' motion to compel responses to questions not answered by Richard Trefflich at his deposition.(Reader, L)
September 27, 2022 Filing 101 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr, The Sadr Law Firm, Ryan Bancaya by Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Edmond Tarverdian, Eric Stell, Diana Akkawi, Steve W. Fox. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
September 25, 2022 Filing 100 "[DISREGARD- Attorney to Refile]" MOTION to and PROPOSED ORDER to SET ASIDE #97 Order Extending Discovery by Kasra Sadr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 9/26/2022 (Rodriguez, E). Modified on 9/27/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
September 21, 2022 Filing 99 REPLY by Diana Akkawi, et al., to #95 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wiseman, Susanna) Modified on 9/22/2022 (Benson, A.).
September 21, 2022 Filing 98 REPLY by Diana Akkawi, et al., to #96 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wiseman, Susanna) Modified on 9/22/2022 (Benson, A.).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/21/2022 GRANTING #39 Motion to Amend the Complaint and #82 Motion for an Order Vacating the Current Discovery Cut-off. Plaintiffs shall file their proposed FAC not later than two (2) days from the date this Memorandum and Order is filed. Non-expert discovery shall be completed no later than one-hundred and eighty (180) days from the date this Memorandum and Order is filed. (Zignago, K.)
September 20, 2022 Filing 96 OPPOSITION by Kasra Sadr to #77 Motion to Compel re R. Trefflich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 9/20/2022 (Benson, A.).
September 19, 2022 Filing 95 OPPOSITION by Kasra Sadr #77 Motion to Compel Responses. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Declaration of Kasra Sadr, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 9/19/2022 (Benson, A.).
September 14, 2022 Filing 94 OPPOSITION by Diana Akkawi, et al., to #78 Motion for Protective Order. Attorney Wiseman, Susanna Fyfe added. (Attachments: #1 t Exhibits, #2 Evidentiary Obejctions to Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Wiseman, Susanna) Modified on 9/15/2022 (Kastilahn, A).
September 13, 2022 Filing 93 JOINT STATEMENT RE: DISCOVERY DISAGREEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
September 13, 2022 Filing 92 JOINT STATEMENT RE: DISCOVERY DISAGREEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration J. Sifers & D. Gardner Declarations, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
September 13, 2022 Filing 91 JOINT STATEMENT RE: DISCOVERY DISAGREEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration J. Sifers & D. Gardner Declarations, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
September 13, 2022 Filing 90 JOINT STATEMENT RE: DISCOVERY DISAGREEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration J. Sifers & D. Gardner Declarations, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
September 8, 2022 Filing 89 OPPOSITION by Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr to #82 Motion to Vacate. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 9/8/2022 (Kaminski, H).
September 7, 2022 Filing 88 JOINT STATEMENT RE: DISCOVERY DISAGREEMENT filed by Defendants Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 9/8/2022 (Zignago, K.).
September 6, 2022 Filing 87 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #77 Motion to Compel, : Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Compel Responses to Questions Not Answered by Richard Trefflich in His Deposition)(Gardner, Dixon)
September 6, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #77 Motion to Compel, : Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Compel Responses to Questions Not Answered Defendant K. Sadr and Defendant Nationwide VIN Marketing at His Deposition)(Gardner, Dixon)
September 6, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #77 Motion to Compel, : Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Documents at Deposition of Defendant Kasra Sadr)(Gardner, Dixon)
September 6, 2022 Filing 84 NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #77 Motion to Compel, : Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Plaintiff's Notice of Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Documents at Deposition of Defendant Nationwide VIN Marketing)(Gardner, Dixon)
September 6, 2022 Filing 83 PROPOSED ORDER re ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION FOR AN ORDER VACATING THE CURRENT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
September 6, 2022 Filing 82 MOTION to VACATE THE CURRENT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
September 2, 2022 Filing 81 PROPOSED ORDER re Amended Motion for Protective Order re #78 Amended Motion for Protective Order by Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
September 2, 2022 Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Pursuant to Local Rule 302(c), Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #77 is to be renoticed before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 9/28/2022 hearing date is VACATED. Pursuant to ECF No. 76 , the Motion is also filed untimely. (Deutsch, S)
September 2, 2022 Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/02/2022 re #78 Motion for Protective Order. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, September 21, 2022 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry) (Anderson, J)
September 1, 2022 Filing 78 AMENDED #66 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER by Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr, The Sadr Law Firm. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 9/2/2022 (Benson, A.).
September 1, 2022 Filing 77 MOTIONS (4) to COMPEL Responses to Requests for Production of Documents and Responses to Questions not Answered at Deposition by Diana Akkawi, et al., Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Compel: Nationwide, #2 Motion to Compel re R. Trefflich, #3 Motion to Compel re K. Sadr, #4 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 9/2/2022 (Benson, A.).
August 24, 2022 Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/24/2022: Discovery in this matter is to be completed by October 1, 2022. ECF No. #5 at 2 (setting a discovery completion deadline 365 days after the last filed answer); ECF No. #32 (Answer filed 10/1/2021). Defendants filed a motion for a protective order and noticed it for September 28, 2022. ECF No. #66 . Because the motion as noticed is too close to the close of discovery to comply with the limitations in the scheduling order (See ECF No. #5 at 2), the hearing date is ADVANCED to September 21, 2022. The Joint Statement is due September 7, 2022. The motion will be considered concurrently with plaintiffs' pending motion to compel (ECF No. #65 ). Both motions will be heard on the papers without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
August 16, 2022 Filing 75 OPPOSITION by Diana Akkawi, et al., to #66 Motion for Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
August 16, 2022 Filing 74 JOINT STATEMENT re Discovery Disagreement #65 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Diana Akkawi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 8/17/2022 (Benson, A.).
August 10, 2022 Filing 73 REPLY by Diana Akkawi, et al to #71 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 8/11/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
August 10, 2022 Filing 72 AMENDED #69 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Diana Akkawi, et al . (Sifers, James) Modified on 8/11/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
August 5, 2022 Filing 71 OPPOSITION by The Mailing Group, Inc. to #65 Motion to Compel. Attorney Paya, Brian added. (Paya, Brian) Modified on 8/9/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
August 1, 2022 Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/01/2022 re #66 Motion for Protective Order. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, September 28, 2022 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
July 27, 2022 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Diana Akkawi, et al., re #65 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 8/1/2022 (Benson, A.).
July 27, 2022 Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/27/2022 re #65 Motion to Compel. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, August 17, 2022 is ordered SUBMITTED without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
July 27, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION to #66 Motion for Protective Order by Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 7/27/2022 (Reader, L).
July 27, 2022 Filing 66 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER by Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 7/27/2022 (Reader, L). Modified on 8/1/2022 (Benson, A.).
July 26, 2022 Filing 65 MOTION to COMPEL The Mailing Group, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena by Diana Akkawi et al. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/5/22 DENYING Motions to Compel #49 , #50 , #51 and #52 . (Kaminski, H)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/1/2022 DENYING without prejudice #40 Motion for Protective Order and VACATING as MOOT #37 Motion for Protective Order.(Perdue, C.)
June 22, 2022 Filing 62 REPLY by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian re #58 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
June 21, 2022 Filing 61 REPLY by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian re #57 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
June 13, 2022 Filing 60 JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Discovery Disagreements in support of #51 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Table of Contents and Table of Authorities, #2 Declarations Of James Sifers And Dixon Gardner, #3 Exhibit 100, #4 Exhibit 101, #5 Exhibit 102, #6 Exhibit 103, #7 Exhibit 104, #8 Exhibit 105, #9 Exhibit 106, #10 Exhibit 107, #11 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 6/14/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
June 13, 2022 Filing 59 JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Discovery Disagreements in support of #49 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Table of Contents and Table of Authorities, #2 Declaration Of James Sifers And Dixon Gardner, #3 Exhibit 100, #4 Exhibit 101, #5 Exhibit 102, #6 Exhibit 103, #7 Exhibit 104, #8 Exhibit 105, #9 Exhibit 106, #10 Exhibit 107, #11 Exhibit 108, #12 Exhibit 109, #13 Exhibit 110, #14 Exhibit 111, #15 Exhibit 112, #16 Exhibit 113, #17 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 6/14/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
June 13, 2022 Filing 58 OPPOSITION by Defendants Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr to #49 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
June 13, 2022 Filing 57 OPPOSITION by Defendant Kasra Sadr to #50 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
June 9, 2022 Filing 56 STATEMENT of DECLARATIONS of James Sifers and Dixon Gardner in SUPPORT of #52 Motion to Compel. (Attachments: #1 Declarations of James Sifers and Dixon Gardner, #2 Exhibit 100, #3 Exhibit 101, #4 Exhibit 102, #5 Exhibit 103, #6 Exhibit 104, #7 Proof of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 6/10/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 8, 2022 Filing 55 STATEMENT of In Support Of #50 Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs Diana Akkawi et al. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 100, #3 Exhibit 101, #4 Exhibit 102, #5 Exhibit 103, #6 Exhibit 104, #7 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 6/9/2022 (Coll, A).
May 23, 2022 Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/23/2022 re 41 Minute Order and #49 , #50 , #51 , and #52 Motions to Compel. On the Courts own motion the #40 Motion for Protective Order currently scheduled for 06/15/2022 is VACATED and RESET for 06/29/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Furthermore the hearing on the motions now calendared for Wednesday, June 29, 2022 are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry) (Anderson, J)
May 20, 2022 Filing 53 EXHIBIT Certificate of Service to the DN 52 Motion To Compel filed by Plaintiff Diana Akkawi re #52 Motion to Compel,. (Gardner, Dixon)
May 20, 2022 Filing 52 MOTION to COMPEL Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents At Deposition Of Defendant Nationwide VIN Marketing by Diana Akkawi. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Gardner, Dixon)
May 20, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION to COMPEL Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Responses To Questions Not Answered By Richard Trefflich In His March 3, 2022 Deposition by Diana Akkawi. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
May 20, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION to COMPEL Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Responses To Request For Production Of Documents At Deposition Of Kasra Sadr by Diana Akkawi. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
May 20, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to COMPEL Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Questions Not Answered By Defendant Kasra Sadr For Himself And Defendant Nationwide VIN Marketing In A February 10, 2022 Deposition by Diana Akkawi. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
May 19, 2022 Filing 48 OBJECTIONS by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell to Declaration re RESPONSE to #39 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 5/20/2022 (Kaminski, H).
May 19, 2022 Filing 47 REPLY by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian to RESPONSE to #39 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
May 18, 2022 Filing 46 REPLY by Car Law Firm et al in support of #40 Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 5/19/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
May 16, 2022 Filing 45 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs to #39 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition, #37 Motion for Protective Order,, #40 Motion for Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 5/17/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 16, 2022 Filing 44 OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs to #39 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition, #37 Motion for Protective Order,, #40 Motion for Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 5/17/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 13, 2022 Filing 43 OPPOSITION by Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr to #39 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kasra Sadr in support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Leave to file first amended complaint)(Sadr, Kasra)
May 9, 2022 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: After review of the Amendment to Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint #39 , the 6/9/2022 hearing date remains VACATED and the opposition and reply due dates to ECF No. #35 are confirmed. (Deutsch, S)
May 4, 2022 Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/04/2022 re #40 Motion for Protective Order. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, June 15, 2022 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Text Only Entry)(Anderson, J)
May 3, 2022 Filing 40 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER by Kasra Sadr. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 11.1, #16 Exhibit 11.2)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 5/4/2022 (Rodriguez, E).
May 2, 2022 Filing 39 AMENDED MOTION to AMEND the #35 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition,, by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
May 2, 2022 Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 6/9/2022 hearing on the Motion to Amend the Complaint #35 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. Further and pursuant to Local Rule 302(c)(1), the Motion for Protective Order #37 is to be renoticed before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 6/9/2022 hearing date is VACATED. (Deutsch, S)
May 2, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION for PROTECTIVE ORDER Limiting Discovery pursuant to FRCP 26(c) by Kasra Sadr. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Notice DEFENDANTS KASRA SADR AND SADRLAW FIRM (dba CAR LAW FIRM)'s NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIONFOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, LIMITINGDISCOVERYPURSUANT TO FRCP 26(c, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS KASRA SADR AND SADR LAWFIRM, APLC (dba CAR LAW FIRM)'s REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, #3 Declaration DEFENDANTS KASRA SADR AND SADRLAW FIRM (dba CAR LAW FIRM)'sNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIONFOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, LIMITINGDISCOVERYPURSUANT TO FRCP 26(c), #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT 6, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT 8, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT 9, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT 10, #14 Exhibit EXHIBIT 11, #15 Exhibit EXHIBIT 11.1, #16 Exhibit EXHIBIT 11.2)(Sadr, Kasra)
May 2, 2022 Filing 36 OPPOSITION by California Department of Motor Vehicles to #35 Motion to Amend the Complaint/Petition,,. (Daily, Kristin)
April 28, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION to AMEND the #1 Complaint, by Diana Akkawi. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 4/29/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 02/28/22 APPROVING #33 Joint Discovery Plan; a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness is due no later than 30 days after receiving this Court's ruling on the last filed dispositive motion. After review of the Parties' Joint Notice of Trial Readiness, the Court will issue an order that sets forth new dates for a final pretrial conference and trial. (Benson, A.)
November 10, 2021 Filing 33 PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN and PROPOSED ORDER by Diana Akkawi, et al., (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, #2 Proof of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 11/10/2021 (Benson, A.).
October 1, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Kasra Sadr. (Attachments: #1 Answer with Jury Demand by Sadr Law Firm, #2 Answer with Jury Demand by Nationwide VIN Marketing)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 10/5/2021 (Benson, A.).
September 22, 2021 Filing 31 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER allowing defendants to file an Answer on or before 10/01/21. by Kasra Sadr. (Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 9/23/2021 (Benson, A.).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/31/2021 DENYING #21 , #22 Motions to Dismiss.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 11, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY by Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr re #27 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 8/13/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/10/2020 DENYING #12 Motion for TRO. (Coll, A)
August 6, 2020 Filing 27 OPPOSITION by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian to #21 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Evidentiary Objections, #3 Evidentiary Objections to Judicial Notice #4 Certificate of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 8/7/2020 (Kaminski, H).
July 30, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 8/6/2020 hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #12 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
July 30, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian re #24 Opposition to Motion, #12 Motion for TRO. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of James Sifers, #2 Evidentiary Objection, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James) Modified on 7/30/2020 (Reader, L).
July 21, 2020 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by Nationwide VIN Marketing, The Sadr Law Firm to #12 Motion for TRO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 1.Notice)(Sadr, Kasra) Modified on 7/22/2020 (Coll, A).
July 7, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by relief courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the August 20, 2020 hearing on the Motions to Dismiss ( #21 and #22 ) is VACATED and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Kennison, L)
July 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, and Anti-Slapp by defendants The Kasra Sadr Law Firm, dba CAR Law Firm and Kasra Sadr. (Hearing set for 8/20/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
July 7, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by The Sadr Law Firm, APLC and Nationwide Vin Marketing. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Kasra Dadr, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Notice Lodging Exhibits, #6 Proof of Service)(Sadr, Kasra)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/2/2020 GRANTING #17 Stipulation and Proposed Order, GRANTING defendants until 7/8/2020 to file a responsive pleading. (Coll, A)
July 1, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The parties are directed to DISREGARD the Text Only Minute Order at ECF No. 18. The Motion to Dismiss #11 is DENIED AS MOOT, given the dismissal of defendant, California Department of Motor Vehicles, at ECF No. 9. (Deutsch, S)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 [DISREGARD AS DOCKETED IN ERROR] MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the August 6, 2020 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #11 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S) Modified on 7/1/2020 (Deutsch, S).
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Request tor Additional Time to File a Responsive Pleading re [ 14 ] Minute Order. by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. Attorney Sifers, James Steven added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sifers, James) Modified on 6/29/2020 (Reader, L).
June 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Court's 14 Minute Order to Set Dates for Plaintiffs' Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 6/25/2020 (Zignago, K.).
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of ERRATA by All Plaintiffs re #12 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Proof of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' Opposition shall be filed no later than Thursday, July 23, 2020, and Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed no later than Thursday, July 30, 2020. If necessary, a hearing to be conducted by videoconference will be set for Thursday, August 6, 2020, at 2:00 PM. After briefing is complete, a further order will issue advising the parties whether a hearing will be set. (Deutsch, S)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER #12 Motion for TRO by Diana Akkawi, et al. (Gardner, Dixon)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER and MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Diana Akkawi, Yasmin Akkawi, Katelyn J. Button, Steve W. Fox, Eric Stell, Edmond Tarverdian. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Diana Akkawi, #3 Declaration of Yasmin Akkawi, #4 Declaration of Katelyn Button, #5 Declaration of Eric Stell, #6 Declaration of Steve W. Fox, #7 Declaration of Edmond Tarverdian, #8 Declaration of James Sifers, #9 Notice Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit E-1, #16 Exhibit F, #17 Exhibit G, #18 Exhibit H, #19 Exhibit I, #20 Exhibit I-1, #21 Exhibit I-2, #22 Exhibit I-3, #23 Exhibit J, #24 Exhibit K, #25 Exhibit L, #26 Exhibit M, #27 Exhibit N, #28 Exhibit O, #29 Exhibit P, #30 Exhibit P-1, #31 Exhibit Q, #32 Exhibit Q-1, #33 Exhibit R, #34 Exhibit S, #35 Exhibit T, #36 Exhibit U, #37 Exhibit V, #38 Exhibit W, #39 Exhibit X, #40 Exhibit Y, #41 Exhibit Z, #42 Proposed Order, #43 Certificate of Service, #44 Proof of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS by California Department of Motor Vehicles. Attorney Daily, Kristin Marie added. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Daily, Kristin)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DISMISSAL APPROVING #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. (a)(1)(A)(i) as to California Department of Motor Vehicles. (York, M)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by All Plaintiffs as to California Department of Motor Vehicles. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 6/15/2020 (York, M).
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION re Service and Response Deadline. Attorney Sifers, James Steven added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sifers, James)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Department of Motor Vehicles served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gardner, Dixon)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: The Sadr Law Firm served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Gardner, Dixon) Modified on 6/3/2020 (Kastilahn, A).
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Department of Motor Vehicles, Car Law Firm, Nationwide VIN Marketing, Kasra Sadr, The Sadr Law Firm* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dixon Leon Gardner* *Madison Law, APC* *17702 Mitchell North* *Irvine, CA 92614*. (Benson, A.)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by all plaintiffs. (Gardner, Dixon)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by all plaintiffs (Gardner, Dixon).
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by all plaintiffs, et al., (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8900495) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Gardner, Dixon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akkawi et al v. Sadr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve W. Fox
Represented By: Dixon Leon Gardner
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Susanna Fyfe Wiseman
Represented By: Alexis Ann Jugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Stell
Represented By: Dixon Leon Gardner
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Susanna Fyfe Wiseman
Represented By: Alexis Ann Jugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmond Tarverdian
Represented By: Dixon Leon Gardner
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Susanna Fyfe Wiseman
Represented By: Alexis Ann Jugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn J. Button
Represented By: Dixon Leon Gardner
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Susanna Fyfe Wiseman
Represented By: Alexis Ann Jugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Akkawi
Represented By: Dixon Leon Gardner
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Susanna Fyfe Wiseman
Represented By: Alexis Ann Jugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasmin Akkawi
Represented By: Dixon Leon Gardner
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Represented By: Susanna Fyfe Wiseman
Represented By: Alexis Ann Jugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasra Sadr
Represented By: Kasra Sadr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Motor Vehicles
Represented By: Kristin Marie Daily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Car Law Firm
Represented By: Kasra Sadr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide VIN Marketing
Represented By: Kasra Sadr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sadr Law Firm
Represented By: Kasra Sadr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Bancaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadr Law Firm
Represented By: Kasra Sadr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narissa Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nima Heydari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: The Mailing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Paya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mailing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Paya
Represented By: James Steven Sifers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?