Tomelleri v. DMB Associates, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: DMB Realty, Inc., Lahontan Golf Club, DMB/Highlands Group, LLC, DMB Development, LLC, Martis Camp Realty, Inc., Lahontan, LLC and DMB Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01035
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Joseph R. Tomelleri. DMB Development, LLC served on 6/25/2020. (Clegg, Perry) Modified on 7/15/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Joseph R. Tomelleri. DMB Realty, Inc. served on 6/25/2020. (Clegg, Perry) Modified on 7/15/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/15/2020 GRANTING #5 Application as to Attorney Ryan Bell, PHV, to represent Joseph R. Tomelleri. (York, M)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/15/2020 GRANTING #4 Application as to Attorney Perry S. Clegg, PHV, to represent Joseph R. Tomelleri. (York, M)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Joseph R. Tomelleri for attorney Ryan B. Bell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8939462) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, Matthew)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Joseph R. Tomelleri for attorney Perry S. Clegg to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8939435) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, Matthew)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* VA 1-827-025 * * Lahonatan cutthroat trout resident, et al., * * Joseph Tomelleri * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *DMB Associates, Inc., DMB Development, LLC, DMB Realty, Inc., DMB/Highlands Group, LLC, Lahontan Golf Club, Lahontan, LLC, Martis Camp Realty, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew Roger Lewis* *Kunzler Bean & Adamson* *4225 Executive Square, Suite 600* *La Jolla, CA 92037*. (Benson, A.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Joseph R. Tomelleri. Attorney Lewis, Matthew Roger added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8901138) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. DMB Associates, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMB Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lahontan Golf Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMB/Highlands Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMB Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martis Camp Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lahontan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMB Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: Matthew Roger Lewis
Represented By: Ryan Bell, PHV
Represented By: Perry S. Clegg, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?