(HC) Henry v. Unknown
Petitioner: Kevin Henry
Respondent: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2020cv01064
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, court's form for application of writ of habeas corpus, and IFP application served on Kevin Henry. (Henshaw, R)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/16/2020 ORDERING, to the extent Petitioner is seeking some form of relief in #1 Letter, this request for relief is denied; GRANTING Petitioner 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a petition; and ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an application to proceed IFP or the filing fee in the amount of $5.00. (Henshaw, R)
May 28, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kevin Henry. (Coll, A)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Unknown by Kevin Henry. (Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Henry v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?