California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. McLane Foodservice, Inc.
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Defendant: McLane Foodservice, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01111
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Anthony M. Barnes. (Barnes, Anthony)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to McLane Foodservice, Inc. on 6/10/2020. (Barnes, Anthony) Modified on 6/25/2020 (Kaminski, H).
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Barnes, Anthony)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *McLane Foodservice, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony M. Barnes* *Aqua Terra Aeris Law Group* *490 43rd Street, Suite 108* *Oakland, CA 94609*. (Benson, A.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McLane Foodservice, Inc. by California Sportfishing Protection Alliance. Attorney Barnes, Anthony M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8918391) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. McLane Foodservice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Represented By: Anthony M. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLane Foodservice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?