(PC) Poarch v. Randy et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Roosevelt Poarch
Defendant: Clifford Freeman, Lenick Randy and Robert Felix Brooke
Case Number: 2:2020cv01191
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE re Use of Force by Gregory Roosevelt Poarch. (Huang, H)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Gregory Roosevelt Poarch RE: Investigation. (York, M)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (York, M)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Gregory Roosevelt Poarch. (York, M)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT by Gregory Roosevelt Poarch in SUPPORT of #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (York, M)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 FURTHER STATEMENT by Gregory Roosevelt Poarch in SUPPORT of #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (York, M)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST to REVIEW Investigation by Gregory Roosevelt Poarch. (York, M)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT by Plaintiff Gregory Roosevelt Poarch. (Kaminski, H)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Gregory Roosevelt Poarch re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Kaminski, H)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT by Gregory Roosevelt Poarch in further SUPPORT of #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (York, M)
June 22, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP application served on Gregory Roosevelt Poarch. (Henshaw, R)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/22/2020 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed IFP. (Henshaw, R)
June 16, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gregory Roosevelt Poarch. (Coll, A)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Gregory Roosevelt Poarch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Poarch v. Randy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenick Randy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Felix Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Roosevelt Poarch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?