(BK) Svenhard's Swedish Bakery v. United States Bakery, et al
Plaintiff: Svenhard's Swedish Bakery
Defendant: Michael Petitt, Allied Packing Corp., Mountain States Bakeries LLC, Northern California General Teamsters Security Fund, Central California Baking Company, United States Bakery, Kenneth Hall and Murrey R. Albers
Trustee: Tracy Hope Davis, Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac) and Office of the U.S. Trustee (Frs)
Not Classified By Court: Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund, Douglas D. Prola, Divine Enterprises, Inc. and Bill D. Pruitt
Case Number: 2:2020cv01205
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 OPPOSITION by Svenhard's Swedish Bakery to #3 Motion to Change Venue,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronny Svenhard, #2 Declaration of David C. Kunkel, #3 Exhibits to Kunkel Declaration, #4 Proof of Service)(Talerico, Derrick)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 OPPOSITION by Svenhard's Swedish Bakery to #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Talerico, Derrick)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Thomas C Bright on behalf of Svenhard's Swedish Bakery. Attorney Bright, Thomas C added. (Bright, Thomas)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Solomon B Cera on behalf of Svenhard's Swedish Bakery. Attorney Cera, Solomon B added. (Cera, Solomon)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to TRANSFER VENUE by Murrey R. Albers, et al. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Steven M. Wilker, #3 Exhibits 1-6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibits 8-12)(Bedoyan, Hagop) Modified on 7/29/2020 (Huang, H).
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw Reference #1 is SET for hearing on August 25, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6 before District Judge John A. Mendez; Opposition or a statement of non-opposition should be filed no less than 14 days prior to the hearing, and replies 7 days prior to the hearing as provided by Local Rule 230. (Text Only Entry) (Vine, H)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to WITHDRAW REFERENCE by Defendants United States Bakery, et al.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (BK) Svenhard's Swedish Bakery v. United States Bakery, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Petitt
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, NCAED
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Packing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain States Bakeries LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, NCAED
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern California General Teamsters Security Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central California Baking Company
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, NCAED
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bakery
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, NCAED
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hall
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, NCAED
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murrey R. Albers
Represented By: Steven M. Wilker
Represented By: Hagop Tatios Bedoyan
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, NCAED
Represented By: Timothy J. Conway, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svenhard's Swedish Bakery
Represented By: Derrick Matthew Talerico
Represented By: Solomon B Cera
Represented By: Thomas C Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Jason M. Blumberg, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Frs)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Bakery and Confectionery Union and Industry International Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Douglas D. Prola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Divine Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Bill D. Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?