Brooks v. Teavana Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Brooks
Defendant: Teavana Corporation and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01225
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/4/20 ORDERING that this action is STAYED except as set forth herein and all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED pending further order of the court. The parties are directed to promptly meet and confer to discuss settlement of this action. No later than fourteen (14) days after completion of the VDRP session, the parties shall jointly file their VDRP Completion Report, consistent with Local Rule 271 (o). (Kaminski, H)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Starbucks Corporation, Teavana Corporation. (Hurley, Gregory)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Starbucks Corporation, Teavana Corporation. Attorney Hurley, Gregory Francis added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Hurley, Gregory) Modified on 7/15/2020 (York, M).
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Teavana Corporation served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (Coelho, Thiago)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Starbucks Corporation served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (Coelho, Thiago)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 KJM Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Becknal, R)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Starbucks Corporation, Teavana Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago Merlini Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Becknal, R)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Valerie Brooks. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8946498) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coelho, Thiago)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Teavana Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teavana Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hurley
Represented By: Bradley J. Leimkuhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hurley
Represented By: Bradley J. Leimkuhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Brooks
Represented By: Thiago Merlini Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?