(HC) Hubbard v. Glenn County Superior Court
Petitioner: Dale Wesley Hubbard, Jr.
Respondent: Glenn County Superior Court
Case Number: 2:2020cv01232
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Dale Wesley Hubbard Jr. (Henshaw, R)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/7/2020 ORDERING Clerk to assign a district judge to this action and RECOMMENDING Petitioner's application for writ of habeas corpus be summarily dismissed and this court decline to issue the certificate of appealability referenced in 28 U.S.C. 2253. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-1232 KJM GGH (HC). (Henshaw, R)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
June 19, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Dale Wesley Hubbard Jr. (Coll, A)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 7/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Coll, A)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Glenn County Superior Court by Dale Wesley Hubbard, Jr. (Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Hubbard v. Glenn County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Glenn County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale Wesley Hubbard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?