Brooks v. See's Candies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Valerie Brooks
Defendant: See's Candies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01236
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant See's Candies, Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Malcolm A. Heinicke re #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Heinicke, Malcolm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by See's Candies, Inc. re #6 MOTION to DISMISS filed by See's Candies, Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by See's Candies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heinicke, Malcolm)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Not More than 28 Days (LR 144) by See's Candies, Inc. Attorney Heinicke, Malcolm A. added. (Heinicke, Malcolm)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: See's Candies, Inc. served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Coelho, Thiago)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *See's Candies, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago Merlini Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Benson, A.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against See's Candies, Inc. by Valerie Brooks. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8949127) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coelho, Thiago)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. See's Candies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See's Candies, Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm A. Heinicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Brooks
Represented By: Thiago Merlini Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?