Carlson v. Shasta Livestock Auction Yard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cristine Carlson
Defendant: Shasta Livestock Auction Yard, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01242
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kennedy, Benjamin)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Shasta Livestock Auction Yard, Inc.. Attorney Snowden, Kelly J. added.(Snowden, Kelly)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Shasta Livestock Auction Yard, Inc. served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Kennedy, Benjamin)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Shasta Livestock Auction Yard, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Benjamin L. Kennedy* *Carr Kennedy Peterson & Frost* *420 Redcliff Drive* *Redding, CA 96002*. (Benson, A.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shasta Livestock Auction Yard, Inc. by Cristine Carlson. Attorney Kennedy, Benjamin L. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8948425) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Shasta Livestock Auction Yard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristine Carlson
Represented By: Benjamin L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta Livestock Auction Yard, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly J. Snowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?