Mirzada v. Wolf et al
Petitioner: Abdul Ghaffar Mirzada
Respondent: Wendell Anderson, Chad Wolf, Richard Valieka and William P. Barr
Case Number: 2:2020cv01250
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE to Sergio Valdovinos: You are not admitted to practice in the U.S. District Court, Eastern District of California. This will be the last electronic notification you receive until you are admitted. Concurrently to this notification, an email with instructions is being sent to you. Please complete the admissions process immediately. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr, Richard Valieka, Chad Wolf* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Sergio Valdovinos* *The Valdovinos Firm* *1280 Rosecrans Avenue #120* *Manhattan Beach, CA 90266*. (Donati, J)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 USCA ORDER: The Petition is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of California. The petition is deemed filed as of 6/10/2020. (Donati, J)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Wendell Anderson, William P. Barr, Richard Valieka, Chad Wolf by Abdul Ghaffar Mirzada.(Donati, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirzada v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wendell Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard Valieka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdul Ghaffar Mirzada
Represented By: Sergio Valdovinos, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?