King v. City of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Travis King
Defendant: Eric Klockenbrink, City of Sacramento, Anthony Boler, Costco Wholesale Corporation and Jonathan Houston
Case Number: 2:2020cv01326
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 11/5/2020 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 9/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Eric Klockenbrink. Attorney Jaime, Matthew Charles added. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Memorandum, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Declaration)(Jaime, Matthew) Modified on 8/12/2020 (Huang, H).
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Travis King.(Patterson, Kellan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Tupolo, A)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Anthony Boler, City of Sacramento, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Jonathan Houston, Eric Klockenbrink* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kellan Steven Patterson* *Law Office of Kellan Patterson* *770 L Street, Suite 950* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Tupolo, A)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Travis King. (Patterson, Kellan)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Travis King. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8973357) (Patterson, Kellan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. City of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Klockenbrink
Represented By: Matthew Charles Jaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Boler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Charles Jaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis King
Represented By: Kellan Steven Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?