Martinez v. Cuccinelli, et al
Plaintiff: Jered Martinez
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf and Terri A. Robinson
Case Number: 2:2020cv01432
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by Defendants. Motion Hearing SET for 10/27/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 )(Hemesath, Audrey) Modified on 9/10/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for defendants. (Hemesath, Audrey) Modified on 9/4/2020 (Zignago, K.).
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Loveman, Ben)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Jered Martinez. All Defendants served on 7/20/20. (Loveman, Ben) Modified on 7/21/2020 (Kaminski, H).
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Terri A. Robinson, Chad Wolf* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Ben Loveman* *Reeves Immigration Law Group* *88 Kearny, Suite 750* *San Francisco, CA 94108*. (Benson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jered Martinez (Loveman, Ben)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jered Martinez. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8998563) (Loveman, Ben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Cuccinelli, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri A. Robinson
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jered Martinez
Represented By: Ben Loveman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?