R.H., et al., v. City of Redding
Plaintiff: R. H. and Estate of Eric Jay Hames
Defendant: City of Redding, Kip Kinneavy, Jay Guterding, Joe Rossi and Brett Leonard
Case Number: 2:2020cv01435
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand by City of Redding, Brett Leonard, Joe Rossi. Attorney Allen, Dale Long added.(Allen, Dale)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jay Guterding, Kip Kinneavy, Brett Leonard, Joe Rossi* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neil Gehlawat* *Tayler & Ring* *1230 Rosecrans Ave., Suite 360* *Manhattan Beach, CA 90266*. (Tupolo, A)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by R. H., Estate of Eric Jay Hames.(Gehlawat, Neil)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/20/2020 GRANTING #6 Motion to Appoint Sheila Brown Guardian ad litem for Plaintiff R.H., a minor. (Coll, A)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED #5 PETITION to APPOINT Sheila Brown as GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Estate of Eric Jay Hames, R. H. (Gehlawat, Neil) Modified on 7/21/2020 (York, M).
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION to APPOINT Sheila Brown as GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Estate of Eric Jay Hames, R. H. (Gehlawat, Neil) Modified on 7/20/2020 (York, M).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Redding* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neil Gehlawat* *Tayler & Ring* *1230 Rosecrans Ave., Suite 360* *Manhattan Beach, CA 90266*. (Benson, A.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Estate of Eric Jay Hames, R. H. (Gehlawat, Neil)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Redding by R.H., et al., (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9000702) Attorney Gehlawat, Neil added. (Gehlawat, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.H., et al., v. City of Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. H.
Represented By: Neil Gehlawat
Represented By: John Cornell Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Eric Jay Hames
Represented By: Neil Gehlawat
Represented By: John Cornell Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Redding
Represented By: Dale Long Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Kinneavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Guterding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Rossi
Represented By: Dale Long Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Leonard
Represented By: Dale Long Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?